JOHNSON et al v. HOLBROOK et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nitza I Quinones Alejandro |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05154 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 26, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 23, 2024 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
BILL AKMAN
|
|
Defendant
INGER ANDERSON
|
|
Defendant
JENNY ANTHONY
|
|
Defendant
AUDREY AZOULAY
|
|
Defendant
SIMA BAHOUS
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL S BARR
|
|
Defendant
TEB BATEY
|
|
Defendant
DAVID BEASLEY
|
|
Defendant
XAVIER BECERRA
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH ROBINETTE BIDEN
|
|
Defendant
LLOYD BLANKFEIN
|
|
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
|
|
Defendant
MICHELLE M BOWMAN
|
|
Defendant
LAEL BRAINARD
|
|
Defendant
JOHN BRATCHER
|
|
Defendant
PETE BUTTIGIEG
|
|
Defendant
LISA D COOK
|
|
Defendant
LISA DUKE CROWELL
|
|
Defendant
MONEISHA CRUDUP
|
|
Defendant
HEATHER DAWBARN
|
|
Defendant
LOUIS DEJOY
|
|
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE COMMISSIONER
|
|
Defendant
JAMIE DIMON
|
|
Defendant
BAKER DONELSON
|
|
Defendant
QU DONGYU
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT L ECHOLS
|
|
Defendant
PHILIP FALCONE
|
|
Defendant
LARRY FINK
|
|
Defendant
JANE FRASER
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL FRERICHS
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD FULD
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD S. FULD, JR.
|
|
Defendant
CAREN GABRIEL
|
|
Defendant
MERRICK GARLAND
|
|
Defendant
TOMMY GARRETT
|
|
Defendant
KRISTALINA GEORGIEVA
|
|
Defendant
DAVID GERREGANO
|
|
Defendant
JAMES P GORMAN
|
|
Defendant
FILLIPO GRANDI
|
|
Defendant
RAFAEL MARIANO GROSSI
|
|
Defendant
REBECA GRYNSPAN
|
|
Defendant
ANTONIO GUTERRES
|
|
Defendant
DEBRA ANNE HAALAND
|
|
Defendant
HOULIN HAO
|
|
Defendant
TREY HARGETT
|
|
Defendant
HEIRS AND ASSIGNS Heirs and Assigns ghebreyesus, tedros adhanom d/b/a TEDROS ADHANOM GHEBREYESUS WHOdirector-general etal.,
|
|
Defendant
JAMES HIVNER
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS HOLBROOK
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL HSU
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL J HSU
|
|
Defendant
GILBERT F HUONGBO
|
|
Defendant
Heirs and Assigns metoki, masahiko MASAHIKO METOKI UPU director-general et al.
|
|
Defendant
ILLINOIS DIRECTOR OF PUBLIC HEALTH HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
|
|
Defendant
PHILIP N JEFFERSON
|
|
Defendant
MATT JERNIGAN
|
|
Defendant
ANDRE LEMAURIO JOHNSON
|
|
Defendant
DEANDRE LATERRIO JOHNSON
|
|
Defendant
JENNINGS JONES
|
|
Defendant
NATALIA KANEM
|
|
Defendant
RANDY KENNEDY
|
|
Defendant
SUNNY AM KOSHY
|
|
Defendant
ANDREW LAPINOT
|
|
Defendant
ALVARO LARIO
|
|
Defendant
ALMAR LATOUR
|
|
Defendant
PHILLIPE LAZZARINI
|
|
Defendant
DAVID LILLARD
|
|
Defendant
KITACK LIM
|
|
Defendant
JOHN J MACK
|
|
Defendant
LYNN MALERBRA
|
|
Defendant
DAVID R MALPASS
|
|
Defendant
ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
|
|
Defendant
MARY MCDUFFIE
|
|
Defendant
KEN MOELIS
|
|
Defendant
ANGELO MOZILO
|
|
Defendant
DONNA MRUTIN
|
|
Defendant
GERD MULLER
|
|
Defendant
NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
|
|
Defendant
EZIKE NGO
|
|
Defendant
NGOZI OKONJO-IWEALA
|
|
Defendant
VIKRAM PANDIT
|
|
Defendant
HENRY M PAULSON
|
|
Defendant
ZURAB POLOLIKASIDVILI
|
|
Defendant
JEROME H POWEL
|
|
Defendant
JEROME H POWELL
|
|
Defendant
AUSTIN PURVIS
|
|
Defendant
KWAME RAOUL
|
|
Defendant
CHARLES PAUL RETTIG
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM ROGERS
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD R ROOKER
|
|
Defendant
CATHERINE M. RUSSELL
|
|
Defendant
JUAN CARLOS SALAZAR
|
|
Defendant
ANDREW SAUL
|
|
Defendant
DARRELL SCARLETT
|
|
Defendant
KLAUS SCHWAB
|
|
Defendant
MAIMUNAH MOHD SHARIF
|
|
Defendant
CARLEE SMITH
|
|
Defendant
DAVID M. SOLOMON
|
|
Defendant
ST. CLAIR COUNTY, ILLINOIS COUNTY C HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
|
|
Defendant
ACHIM STEINER
|
|
Defendant
PETTERI TAALAS
|
|
Defendant
DAREN TANG
|
|
Defendant
ROYCE TAYLOR
|
|
Defendant
BANY TIDWELL
|
|
Defendant
LYNN TILTON
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT TOM
|
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES POST OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of the Army HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
|
|
Defendant
ANTONIO VITORINO
|
|
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER WALLER
|
|
Defendant
GHADA FATHI WALY
|
|
Defendant
JESSE WHITE
|
|
Defendant
JUSTIN WILSON
|
|
Defendant
JANET LOUISE YELLEN
|
|
Defendant
chief executive officer TRUISTBANK HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
|
|
Defendant
chief executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assigns
|
|
Defendant
davidson county, tennessee circuit court clerk HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
|
|
Defendant
illinois secretary of state et al HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
|
|
Defendant
metcalfe county, kentucky circuit court clerk HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
|
|
Defendant
slatery iii, herbert
|
|
Defendant
tennessee supreme court clerk et al HEIRS AND ASSIGNS
|
|
Plaintiff
ANDRE LEMAURIO JOHNSON ET AL
|
|
Plaintiff
ANDRECIA LEMAURIE BEASLEY ET AL.
|
|
Plaintiff
DEANDRE LATERRIO JOHNSON ESTATE ET AL
|
|
Plaintiff
AMUUR MATIYN ZAAKIR EL TRUST
|
|
Plaintiff
ANDRE LEMAURIO JOHNSON
7115 SOUTHPOINT PARKWAY SUITE 5-190
BRENTWOOD, TN 37027 |
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Tue 03/19 8:11 AM
DOC. #5 MAILED TO PRO SE ANDRE LEMAURIO JOHNSON (tomg) |
||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER THAT IN LIGHT OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF ANDRE LEMAURIO JOHNSONS FAILURE TO EITHER PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CIVIL ACTION OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AS DIRECTED BY ORDER ENTERED ON JANUARY 11, 2024,4 , WHICH (A) GRANTED HIM THIRTY (30) DAYS TO DO SO AND (B) WARNED HIM THAT IF HE FAILED TO COMPLY WITH THE ORDER THIS CASE WOULD BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT JOHNSONS CASE IS DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/18/24. 3/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(bw) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER THAT PRO SE PLAINTIFF ANDRE LEMAURIO JOHNSON1 HAVING FILED A COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT IF JOHNSON SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1) PAY $405 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $55 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL JOHNSON WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. JOHNSON MAY USE THIS FORM TO SEEK LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IF HE CANNOT AFFORD TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE. IF JOHNSON FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/11/24. 1/11/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(bw) |
|
misc
Remark
Thu 01/11 12:13 PM
COPY OF DOC. NO. 4 AND IFP APPLICATION HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, JOHNSON. (bw) |
||
Tuesday, December 26, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() E CONSENT NOTICE MAILED TO PRO SE JOHNSON (rf, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (rf, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/29/2023) (lisad, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against BILL AKMAN(d/b/a BILL AKMAN chief executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assigns), INGER ANDERSON, JENNY ANTHONY, AUDREY AZOULAY, SIMA BAHOUS, MICHAEL S BARR, TEB BATEY, DAVID BEASLEY, XAVIER BECERRA(d/b/a XAVIER BECERR secretary of us dept of health and human services et. al., Heirs and Assigns ), XAVIER BECERRA(d/b/a XAVIER BECERRA secretary of us dept of health and human services et. al., Heirs and Assigns ), JOSEPH ROBINETTE BIDEN, LLOYD BLANKFEIN, ANTONY BLINKEN, MICHELLE M BOWMAN, LAEL BRAINARD, JOHN BRATCHER, PETE BUTTIGIEG, LISA D COOK, LISA DUKE CROWELL, MONEISHA CRUDUP, HEATHER DAWBARN, LOUIS DEJOY, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE COMMISSIONER, JAMIE DIMON, BAKER DONELSON, QU DONGYU, ROBERT L ECHOLS, PHILIP FALCONE(d/b/a PIIlLIP FALCONE chief executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assign), PHILIP FALCONE(d/b/a PIIlLIP FALCONE chief executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assigns ), LARRY FINK, JANE FRASER, MICHAEL FRERICHS, RICHARD FULD, RICHARD S. FULD, JR, CAREN GABRIEL, MERRICK GARLAND, TOMMY GARRETT, KRISTALINA GEORGIEVA, DAVID GERREGANO, JAMES P GORMAN, FILLIPO GRANDI, RAFAEL MARIANO GROSSI, REBECA GRYNSPAN, ANTONIO GUTERRES, DEBRA ANNE HAALAND, HOULIN HAO, TREY HARGETT, HEIRS AND ASSIGNS Heirs and Assigns ghebreyesus, tedros adhanom d/b/a TEDROS ADHANOM GHEBREYESUS WHOdirector-general etal.,, JAMES HIVNER, THOMAS HOLBROOK, MICHAEL J HSU, MICHAEL HSU, GILBERT F HUONGBO, Heirs and Assigns metoki, masahiko MASAHIKO METOKI UPU director-general et al., ILLINOIS DIRECTOR OF PUBLIC HEALTH HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, PHILIP N JEFFERSON, MATT JERNIGAN, ANDRE LEMAURIO JOHNSON, DEANDRE LATERRIO JOHNSON, JENNINGS JONES(d/b/a JENNING JONES rutherford county, tennessee district attorney general et al HEIRS AND ASSIGNS), JENNINGS JONES(jennings d/b/a JENNING JONES rutherford county, tennessee district attorney general et al HEIRS AND ASSIGN), NATALIA KANEM, RANDY KENNEDY, SUNNY AM KOSHY, ANDREW LAPINOT, ALVARO LARIO, ALMAR LATOUR, PHILLIPE LAZZARINI, DAVID LILLARD, KITACK LIM, JOHN J MACK, LYNN MALERBRA(lynn d/b/a LYNN MALERBA treasurer of the United States Heirs and Assigns), DAVID R MALPASS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MARY MCDUFFIE, KEN MOELIS(d/b/a KEN MOELIS chief.executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assigns), KEN MOELIS(d/b/a KEN MOELIS chief.executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assigns ), ANGELO MOZILO(d/b/a ANGELO MOZILO chief executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assigns ), DONNA MRUTIN, GERD MULLER, NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, EZIKE NGO, NGOZI OKONJO-IWEALA, VIKRAM PANDIT, HENRY M PAULSON(d/b/a HENRY M. PAULSON chief executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assigns ), HENRY M PAULSON(d/b/a HENRY PAULSON chief executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assigns ), ZURAB POLOLIKASIDVILI, JEROME H POWEL, JEROME H POWELL, AUSTIN PURVIS, KWAME RAOUL, CHARLES PAUL RETTIG, WILLIAM ROGERS, RICHARD R ROOKER, CATHERINE M. RUSSELL, JUAN CARLOS SALAZAR, ANDREW SAUL, DARRELL SCARLETT, KLAUS SCHWAB, MAIMUNAH MOHD SHARIF, CARLEE SMITH, DAVID M. SOLOMON, ST. CLAIR COUNTY, ILLINOIS COUNTY C HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, ACHIM STEINER, PETTERI TAALAS, DAREN TANG, ROYCE TAYLOR, BANY TIDWELL, LYNN TILTON(d/b/a LYNN TILTON chief executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assigns ), LYNN TILTON (d/b/a LYNN TILTON chief executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assign ), ROBERT TOM, UNITED STATES POST OFFICE HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, United States Department of HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, United States Department of the Army HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, ANTONIO VITORINO, CHRISTOPHER WALLER, GHADA FATHI WALY, JESSE WHITE, JUSTIN WILSON, JANET LOUISE YELLEN, chief executive officer TRUISTBANK HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, chief executive officer of wall street et al., Heirs and Assigns, davidson county, tennessee circuit court clerk HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, illinois secretary of state et al HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, metcalfe county, kentucky circuit court clerk HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, slatery iii, herbert, tennessee supreme court clerk et al HEIRS AND ASSIGNS, filed by AMUUR MATIYN ZAAKIR EL TRUST, ANDRECIA LEMAURIE BEASLEY ET AL., ANDRE LEMAURIO JOHNSON, ANDRE LEMAURIO JOHNSON ET AL, DEANDRE LATERRIO JOHNSON ESTATE ET AL.*NO IFP. NO FEE PAID*(rf, ) |