Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:23-cr-01515
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2023
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2023 1:36 AM CST
Defendant
David Wesley Hamilton (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Raul Guerra
Federal Public Defender, Southern District Of Texas
contact info
Material Witness
Porfirio Clemente-Nepamuceno
Represented By
Oscar A Vela, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Manuel Arnoldo Cardenas, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 2:20 PM CDT
Friday, December 01, 2023
1 1 3 pgs Proposed COMPLAINT as to David Wesley Hamilton (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 12/4/2023 at 09:33 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (VeronicaMadrigal, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to David Wesley Hamilton, filed.(VeronicaMadrigal, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Porfirio Clemente-Nepamuceno as to David Wesley Hamilton. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 12/4/2023 at 09:33 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos, filed.(VeronicaMadrigal, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
4 4 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on December 1, 2023 at 11:27 AM as to David Wesley Hamilton. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (VeronicaMadrigal, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
Attorney update in case as to David Wesley Hamilton. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for David Wesley Hamilton added. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to David Wesley Hamilton held on 12/4/2023. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Bond set at $75 000.00 c/s. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. Defendant sworn in. Waiver of Preliminary hearing submitted to the Court. Appearances: Manuel Cardenas, AUSA; FPD Carlos M. Alaniz (on duty); USPO: Brenda Garza; USM: Deputy Aguero. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:37 AM - 9:52 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Raul Gonzalez, not used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 12/7/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS Porfirio Clemente-Nepamuceno as to David Wesley Hamilton (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 12/4/2023. Material Witness advised that no charges are pending and that Material Witness is temporarily detained in case pending Detention Hearing set for 12/7/2023 at 10:01 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. Financial Affidavit executed. Material Witness requests appointed counsel. Private Attorney appointed. Next on list: Oscar Vela. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. Material witness sworn in. Appearances: Unlisted and Manuel Cardenas, AUSAs; Oscar Vela f/Material Witness. (Tape #10:20 AM - 10:26 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (DUSM: Deputy Aguero) (Interpreter: Raul Gonzalez/used) (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
5 5 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to David Wesley Hamilton, filed. Agent: Joshua O'Bannon (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER on Material Witness Affidavit. The material witness(es) are committed to the custody of the U.S. Marshal's Service pending a detention hearing. Agent: Joshua O'Bannon (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by David Wesley Hamilton, filed. (AnabelPottin, 5). [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
9 9 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to David Wesley Hamilton. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF SETTING as to David Wesley Hamilton. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 12/7/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
11 11 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Material Witness Porfirio Clemente-Nepamuceno as to David Wesley Hamilton, filed. (AnabelPottin, 5). [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Porfirio Clemente-Nepamuceno. Oscar Vela appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS Porfirio Clemente-Nepamuceno to the custody of the United States Marshal. Detention Hearing set for 12/7/2023 at 10:01 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
14 14 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by David Wesley Hamilton, filed.(AnabelPottin, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Raul Guerra, Federal Public Defender, in case as to David Wesley Hamilton, filed.(Guerra, Raul) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Manuel Arnoldo Cardenas, Jr appearing for USA, filed.(Cardenas, Manuel) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
**Terminate Material Witness Detention Deadlines and Hearings as to David Wesley Hamilton: Material witness waived detention. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Material Witness Porfirio Clemente-Nepamuceno in the case of David Wesley Hamilton, filed.(Vela, Oscar) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Porfirio Clemente-Nepamuceno to the custody of the United States Marshal. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
17 17 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to David Wesley Hamilton. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (hcortez, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
18 18 BOND ORDER as to David Wesley Hamilton, The Court, having considered the Probation Report received on December 13, 2023, is of the opinion and hereby orders that the defendants bond be set at $75,000.00 UNSECURED bond with any additional bond conditions as set out by Probation Services. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (VeronicaMadrigal, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
19 19 APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to David Wesley Hamilton in amount of $ 75,000 unsecured bond,, filed. (VeronicaMadrigal, 5) [5:23-mj-02122]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
20 20 3 pgs INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to David Wesley Hamilton (1) count(s) 1, 2, filed. (TanyaTrevino, 5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment