Puerto Rico District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00437
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2023
Terminated:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2023 3:24 AM AST
Defendant
Rafael Angel Casiano-Torres (1)
Represented By
Edwin A. Mora-Rolland
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Defendant
Yadiel Concepcion-Hernandez (3)
Represented By
Luz M. Rios-Rosario
Luz M. Rios-Rosario
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Llanos-Cruz (2)
Represented By
Ian Carlos Garcia-Ferreras
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation Office
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Camille Garcia-Jimenez
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 9:00 PM AST
Thursday, November 30, 2023
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Rafael Angel Casiano-Torres (1), Jonathan Llanos-Cruz (2), Yadiel Concepcion-Hernandez (3). (rim)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Case as to Rafael Angel Casiano-Torres (1), Jonathan Llanos-Cruz (2), Yadiel Concepcion-Hernandez (3). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 11/30/2023. (rim)
Related: [-]
3 3 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Rafael Angel Casiano-Torres (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Jonathan Llanos-Cruz (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Yadiel Concepcion-Hernandez (3) count(s) 1, 4. (rim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NPV Indictment
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler: Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to Rafael Angel Casiano-Torres (1), Jonathan Llanos-Cruz (2), Yadiel Concepcion-Hernandez (3) held on 11/30/2023. Arraignment to be set upon arrest. The Court granted the government's motion to seal. Arrest warrants to be issued. (Court Reporter DCR.)(Hearing held in OSJ Courtroom 6.) (rim)
Related: [-]
5 5 *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Issued by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler in case as to Rafael Angel Casiano-Torres (1), Jonathan Llanos-Cruz (2), Yadiel Concepcion-Hernandez (3). (rim)
Related: [-]