Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas B Mcnamara
Case #: 1:23-bk-16068
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Aug 23, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Guanella Pass Brewing Company, LLC
PO Box 952
Georgetown, CO 80444-0952
Represented By
Katharine S. Sender
Katharine Sender Esq
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294


Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
143 143 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/23 10:18 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 24. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 142 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Monday, April 21, 2025
142 142 order Dismiss Case Mon 04/21 11:35 AM
Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Related [+]. (jss)
Related: [-] 140 Motion to Dismiss Case
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
141 141 misc Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Wed 04/16 9:41 AM
Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Douglas W Brown on behalf of Clear Creek Economic Development Corp. Related [+]. (Brown, Douglas)
Related: [-] 140 Motion to Dismiss Case