Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00320
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2023
Terminated:May 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 31, 2023 1:25 AM CST
Defendant
Mark Rubin (1)
Represented By
Nick Oberheiden
Oberheiden PC
contact info
Lynette S Byrd
Oberheiden P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
P.J. Meitl-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/02/2024 1:04 PM CDT
Friday, December 01, 2023
1 1 FELONY INFORMATION as to Mark Rubin (1) count 1. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (sre) Modified on 12/4/2023 (sre).
Related: [-]