Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00323
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2023
Terminated:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 31, 2023 1:25 AM CST
Defendant
Carlos Hornedo (1)
Represented By
Jennifer Rudenick Ecklund
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
Tim Johnson
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
P.J. Meitl-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jan 10 2024
Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Carlos Hornedo. Re: 16 Consent Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/10/2024) (saw)
GPO Jan 25 2024
ORDER ACCEPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ADJUDGING DEFENDANT GUILTY as to Carlos Hornedo. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 1/25/2024) (saw) Modified docket text on 1/25/2024 (saw).

Docket last updated: 01/26/2025 1:05 PM CST
Friday, December 01, 2023
1 1 5 pgs FELONY INFORMATION as to Carlos Hornedo (1) count 1. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (saw)
Related: [-]