District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:John D Bates
Case #: 1:24-cv-00002
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 30, 2024 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
ANTONY J. BLINKEN
Represented By
Fithawi Berhane
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
UR MENDOZA JADDOU
Represented By
Fithawi Berhane
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
HE WANG
356 TIMBERTON CIRCLE
BELLEFONTE, PA 16823
Represented By
Dehai Tao
Dehai Tao, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PENG ZHAO
101 E. ROSES ROAD
SAN GABRIEL, CA 91775
Represented By
Dehai Tao
Dehai Tao, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 08/20 5:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by PENG ZHAO. (Tao, Dehai)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/15 11:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of9 defendants' consent motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendants shall respond to the complaint by not later than August 12, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/15/2024. (lcjdb3)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to Fri 07/12 8:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to by ANTONY J. BLINKEN, UR MENDOZA JADDOU. (Berhane, Fithawi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/29 11:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of8 defendants' consent motion for extension of time to respond, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendants shall respond to the complaint by not later than July 12, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/29/2024. (lcjdb3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to Tue 05/28 4:55 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by ANTONY J. BLINKEN, UR MENDOZA JADDOU. (Berhane, Fithawi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/10 10:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of7 defendants' consent motion for an extension of time to respond, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendants shall respond to the complaint by not later than May 28, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/10/2024. (lcjdb3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to Tue 04/09 5:14 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by ANTONY J. BLINKEN, UR MENDOZA JADDOU. (Berhane, Fithawi)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to Mon 03/11 1:13 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by ANTONY J. BLINKEN, UR MENDOZA JADDOU. (Berhane, Fithawi)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/11 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Fithawi Berhane on behalf of All Defendants (Berhane, Fithawi)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/11 4:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of6 defendants' consent motion for an extension of time to respond, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendants shall respond to the complaint by not later than April 10, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/8/2024. (lcjdb3)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Mon 01/22 12:19 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/10/2024. (Tao, Dehai)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Wed 01/17 2:47 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/10/2024. (Tao, Dehai)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 01/02 2:44 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/02 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against ANTONY J. BLINKEN, UR MENDOZA JADDOU ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10589463) filed by PENG ZHAO, HE WANG.(Tao, Dehai)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summon
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/02 2:39 PM
Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zcb)
Related: [-]