California Eastern District Court
Judge:William B Shubb
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:24-cv-00001
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 30, 2024 1:44 AM PDT
Defendant
Rob Bonta
Represented By
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Erika Calderon
Represented By
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Reji Varghese
Represented By
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Neutral
Lynette Diane Hecker
California Attorney General's Office 2550 Mariposa Mall, Ste. 5090
Fresno, CA 93721
Represented By
Lynette Diane Hecker
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Children's Health Defense
Represented By
Richard Aaron Jaffe
Richard Jaffe Esq.
contact info
Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., PHV
contact info
Plaintiff
Le Trinh Hoang
Represented By
Richard Aaron Jaffe
Richard Jaffe Esq.
contact info
Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., PHV
contact info
Plaintiff
Pierre Kory
Represented By
Richard Aaron Jaffe
Richard Jaffe Esq.
contact info
Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., PHV
contact info
Plaintiff
Physicians for Informed Consent
Represented By
Richard Aaron Jaffe
Richard Jaffe Esq.
contact info
Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., PHV
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Tyson
Represented By
Richard Aaron Jaffe
Richard Jaffe Esq.
contact info
Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., PHV
contact info

GPO Jan 03 2024
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/03/24 RELATING cases 2:22-cv-1980 WBS AC, 2:22-cv-2147 WBS AC and 2:24-cv-0001 DJC AC. This related case is REASSIGNED to District Judge William B. Shubb for all further proceedings; Magistrate Judge Allison Clair will remain on the case; any dates currently set in this case are VACATED. District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta is no longer assigned to case. The case number on all future filings shall be: 2:24-cv-0001 WBS AC (cc: DJC). (Benson, A.)
GPO Jan 10 2024
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/09/2024 GRANTING 7 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., PHV for Children's Health Defense, Le Trinh Hoang, Pierre Kory, Physicians for Informed Consent, and Brian Tyson. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Lopez, K)
GPO Feb 01 2024
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 02/01/24, per 12 Stipulation, EXTENDING time for Defendants to respond to complaint to 03/04/24. (Benson, A.)
GPO Feb 21 2024
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 02/20/24 SETTING the date for Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction to 03/15/24 and Plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion for a preliminary injunction to 03/22/24. (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO Apr 12 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 4/11/24 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 6/17/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb, pending ruling on the pending motion for preliminary injunction. The parties' joint status report shall be filed no later than 6/3/24. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Apr 23 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 4/22/2024 DENYING 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Woodson, A)
GPO May 17 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 05/17/24 DIREICTING Defendants' response to Plaintiffs; complaint be filed no later than 30 days after a mandate issues from the Ninth Circuit and CONTINUING the Scheduling Conference to 9/9/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb and CONTINUING the joint status report deadline no later than 08/26/24. (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO Jun 25 2024
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 06/24/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cv-00001 WBS AC and 2:24-cv-1138 WBS AC. (Licea Chavez, V)

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
42 42 misc Designation of Counsel Wed 01/22 3:09 PM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., PHV terminated (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
41 41 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Mon 01/13 3:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The Court is in receipt of the Joint Status Report filed 1/9/202540 informing the Court that Plaintiffs' Application for a Stay/Injunction was docketed at the United States Supreme Court, Case No. 24A670, and hereby orders the Scheduling Conference reset for 7/28/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb. A further joint status report shall be filed no later than 7/14/2025. (Deputy Clerk KKS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
40 40 misc Status Report Thu 01/09 2:58 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Pierre Kory. (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
39 39 appeal USCA Order/Mandate/Memo Fri 12/20 4:30 PM
USCA MANDATE as to24 Notice of Appeal filed by Pierre Kory. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (Lopez, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
37 37 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 08/27 10:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The Court is in receipt of the Joint Status Report filed 8/26/202436 informing the Court that oral argument on the appeal is now set before the Ninth Circuit on 11/4/2024, and hereby orders the Scheduling Conference reset for 1/27/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb. A further joint status report shall be filed no later than 1/13/2025. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
36 36 misc Status Report Mon 08/26 5:38 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Rob Bonta, Erika Calderon, Reji Varghese. (Liska, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
35 35 misc Transcript Fri 07/05 1:43 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/01/2024, before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb, filed by Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett, Phone number 916-741-3475 E-mail reporter.bennett@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 7/26/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/5/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2024. (Bennett, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
34 34 3 pgs order Order Tue 06/25 9:46 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 06/24/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cv-00001 WBS AC and 2:24-cv-1138 WBS AC. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 06/21 10:07 AM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:24-cv-01138-TLN-CSK by Lynette Diane Hecker. Attorney Hecker, Lynette Diane added. (Hecker, Lynette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
32 32 misc Transcript Ordering Form Wed 05/29 1:51 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Pierre Kory for proceedings held on 03/01/2024 before Judge Shubb. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 05/17 11:23 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 05/17/24 DIREICTING Defendants' response to Plaintiffs; complaint be filed no later than 30 days after a mandate issues from the Ninth Circuit and CONTINUING the Scheduling Conference to 9/9/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb and CONTINUING the joint status report deadline no later than 08/26/24. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
30 30 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 05/15 11:14 AM
USCA CASE NUMBER 24-2946 for24 Notice of Appeal filed by Pierre Kory. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
29 29 appeal Transcript Ordering Form Wed 05/15 9:53 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Pierre Kory for proceedings held on 04/01/2024 before Judge Shubb. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
28 28 appeal Transcript Ordering Form Tue 05/14 7:56 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Pierre Kory for proceedings held on 4/1/2024 before Judge Shubb re24 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 05/10 1:57 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond by Rob Bonta, Erika Calderon, Reji Varghese.(Liska, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
26 26 misc Transcript Ordering Form Fri 05/10 1:31 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Pierre Kory for proceedings held on 4/1/2024 before Judge Shubb. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
25 25 appeal Appeal Processed to USCA Fri 05/03 10:56 AM
APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re24 Notice of Appeal filed by Pierre Kory. Notice of Appeal filed *4/29/2024*, Complaint filed *1/2/2024* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *4/23/2024*. Court Reporter: *Kimberly Bennett*. *Fee Status: Paid on 4/29/2024 in the amount of $605.00* (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Information
Monday, April 29, 2024
24 24 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 04/29 6:55 PM
NOTICE of APPEAL by Pierre Kory. (Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ACAEDC-11495388) (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
23 23 27 pgs order Order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Tue 04/23 11:55 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 4/22/2024 DENYING14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 04/12 9:53 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 4/11/24 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 6/17/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb, pending ruling on the pending motion for preliminary injunction. The parties' joint status report shall be filed no later than 6/3/24. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 04/10 6:36 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for a Continuance of the April 22, 2024 Status Conference by Rob Bonta, Erika Calderon, Reji Varghese.(Liska, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 01, 2024
20 20 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Mon 04/01 2:30 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 4/1/2024 re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction14 . Counsel argue. MOTION SUBMITTED. The Court to issue a separate order. Plaintiffs' Counsel Richard Jaffe present. Defendants' Counsel Kristin Liska, Megan O'Carroll present. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
19 19 respm Proposed Order Thu 03/28 5:58 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re Plaintiffs Preliminary Injunction Motion re14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
18 18 misc Reply Thu 03/21 5:55 PM
REPLY by Pierre Kory re14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,.(Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Amended proposed order
Friday, March 15, 2024
17 17 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 03/15 9:46 PM
OPPOSITION by Rob Bonta, Erika Calderon, Reji Varghese to14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,.(Liska, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Erika Calderon, Executive Director of the Osteopathic Medical Board of California,
Att: 2 Declaration of Reji Varghese, Executive Director of the Medical Board of California
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 02/21 12:06 PM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 02/20/24 SETTING the date for Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction to 03/15/24 and Plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion for a preliminary injunction to 03/22/24. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
15 15 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 02/16 5:00 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Deadlines for Briefing Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and to Extend the Time to Respond by Rob Bonta, Erika Calderon, Reji Varghese.(Liska, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, February 10, 2024
14 14 motion Preliminary Injunction Sat 02/10 2:31 PM
MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Pierre Kory. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.(Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Sanjay Verma MD,
Att: 2 Declaration Pierre Kory MD,
Att: 3 Declaration Le Trinh Hoang DO,
Att: 4 Declaration Brian Tyson MD,
Att: 5 Declaration Debbie Hobel,
Att: 6 Declaration Neil Selflinger,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 01, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/01 1:10 PM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 02/01/24, per12 Stipulation, EXTENDING time for Defendants to respond to complaint to 03/04/24. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 01/31 4:44 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Rob Bonta, Erika Calderon, Reji Varghese.(Liska, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/31 4:41 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kristin A. Liska on behalf of Rob Bonta, Erika Calderon, Reji Varghese. Attorney Liska, Kristin A. added. (Liska, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/16 11:04 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
9 9 cmp Complaint Mon 01/15 1:56 PM
COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against All Plaintiffs by Pierre Kory.(Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/10 9:35 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/09/2024 GRANTING7 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., PHV for Children's Health Defense, Le Trinh Hoang, Pierre Kory, Physicians for Informed Consent, and Brian Tyson. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Lopez, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/05 3:59 PM
MOTION pro hav vice order by Pierre Kory. (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
utility Pro Hac Vice Application Fee Fri 01/05 3:54 PM
PAYMENT for Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11275295. (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
6 6 misc Civil New Case Documents for WBS Wed 01/03 2:29 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
5 5 4 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 01/03 2:27 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/03/24 RELATING cases 2:22-cv-1980 WBS AC, 2:22-cv-2147 WBS AC and 2:24-cv-0001 DJC AC. This related case is REASSIGNED to District Judge William B. Shubb for all further proceedings; Magistrate Judge Allison Clair will remain on the case; any dates currently set in this case are VACATED. District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta is no longer assigned to case. The case number on all future filings shall be: 2:24-cv-0001 WBS AC (cc: DJC). (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Related Case Tue 01/02 1:43 PM
NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:22-cv-02147, 2:22-cv-01980 by Pierre Kory. (Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for DJC Tue 01/02 10:42 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Tue 01/02 10:41 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Rob Bonta, Erika Calderon, Reji Varghese* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard Aaron Jaffe* *Richard Jaffe ESQ.* *428 J St., 4th Floor* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/02 9:30 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Jaffe, Richard Aaron added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BCAEDC-11265915)(Jaffe, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet