Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephen H Locher
Referred: Stephen B Jackson, Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-00002
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:2101 Worker Adjustment Retraining Notification Act
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 30, 2024 3:50 AM CDT
Defendant
IR Labs DE, LLC
Represented By
Sarah J. Millsap
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ne)
contact info
Ann Louise Zebrowski
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ne)
contact info
Randall D. Armentrout
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Matthew A. McGuire
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Defendant
SourceTek, Inc.
Represented By
Bryony Joy Whitaker
Maynard Nexsen, P.C.
contact info
Angel Anna West
Maynard Nexsen, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Chad Lyons
Represented By
William Jackson Simpson
Langston & Lott, PLLC
contact info
Timm W. Reid
Reid Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Christian Taveras
Represented By
William Jackson Simpson
Langston & Lott, PLLC
contact info
Timm W. Reid
Reid Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
39 39 order Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/27 9:19 AM
ORDER Granting38 Motion Joint Motion for Settlement Approval. The parties shall file a joint status report within 180 days. See Order for further particulars. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 2/27/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
38 38 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/14 1:58 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Chad Lyons.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 2/28/2025.(Simpson, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Notice and Claim Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit Simpson Declaration
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
37 37 order Closing Documents 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 01/15 3:50 PM
TEXT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND SETTING DEADLINE: Given the parties' representations as to settlement of this matter33 , the trial and final pretrial conference are removed from the court's calendar and any remaining deadlines are cancelled. The parties shall file their joint motion for approval of the settlement by February 14, 2025. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/15/2025. (jeb)
Related: [-]
36 36 minutes Status Conference Wed 01/15 3:44 PM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/15/2025. Counsel for parties joined conference. Order to be entered. Court Time: 10 minutes. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
35 35 order Order Mon 01/13 12:09 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephonic Status Conference set for January 15, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. will be held as scheduled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/13/2025. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
34 34 misc Status Report Fri 01/10 4:10 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by IR Labs DE, LLC. (Armentrout, Randall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
33 33 misc Status Report Wed 01/08 4:03 PM
STATUS REPORT by IR Labs DE, LLC. (Armentrout, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
32 32 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 01/03 3:05 PM
TEXT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Status Conference will be held January 15, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. before Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. To join the conference, counsel shall call 833-990-9400 and enter ID 255-961-705 and code 1585. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/3/2025. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Consent Thu 09/12 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Consent(s) by Chad Lyons Notice of Consent to Be A Party Plaintiff and Opt In Lawsuit(Simpson, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent To Be A Party Plaintiff
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/13 5:10 PM
ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 8/13/2024. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Final Pretrial Order Form
29 29 order Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Tue 08/13 5:02 PM
SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Initial Disclosures due by 8/15/2024. Motions to Add Parties due by 9/23/2024. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/23/2024. Motion for class/collective certification due by 12/13/2024. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/23/2024. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/24/2025. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/26/2025. Discovery Deadline 5/23/2025. Dispositive Motion Deadline 6/23/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2025 11:00 a.m. in Des Moines Courthouse before Judge Stephen H. Locher. Jury Trial set to begin 12/8/2025 9:00 a.m. in Des Moines Courthouse before Judge Stephen H. Locher. Estimated length 10 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 8/13/2024. (jeb)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 08/13 3:34 PM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/13/2024. Counsel for parties joined conference. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 15 minutes. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
27 27 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 08/06 2:41 PM
TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held August 13, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. before Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 8/6/2024. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
26 26 motion Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Thu 08/01 4:25 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Simpson, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
25 25 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/26 4:12 PM
TEXT ORDER granting24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William R. Gignilliat IV. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 7/26/2024. (kjw)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Fri 07/26 1:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5513671 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by IR Labs DE, LLC. (Gignilliat, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
23 23 notice Notice - Other Thu 07/25 2:59 PM
NOTICE by Chad Lyons Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Discovery to SourceTek . (Simpson, William)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice - Other Thu 07/25 2:57 PM
NOTICE by Chad Lyons Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Discovery to IR Labs . (Simpson, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 07/12 5:27 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint by SourceTek, Inc..(West, Angel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT Fri 06/28 12:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by SourceTek, Inc.. (West, Angel)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT Fri 06/28 9:17 AM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by IR Labs DE, LLC. (Armentrout, Randall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
18 18 order Extension of Time to File Thu 06/20 2:08 PM
TEXT ORDER granting17 Defendant SourceTek, Inc.'s Unresisted Motion for Third Extension of Time to Move or Plead. Defendant SourceTek, Inc. has until July 12, 2024 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/20/2024. (jeb)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Thu 06/20 1:13 PM
Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File by SourceTek, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 7/5/2024. (West, Angel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 06/07 9:21 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendants 6/28/2024. (nla)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 05/31 4:33 PM
Defendant IR Labs DE, LLC's ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by IR Labs DE, LLC.(Armentrout, Randall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
15 15 order Extension of Time to File Tue 05/28 3:25 PM
TEXT ORDER granting14 Defendant SourceTek, Inc.'s Unresisted Motion for Second Extension of Time to Move or Plead. Defendant SourceTek, Inc. has until June 21, 2024 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/28/2024. (jeb)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 05/28 3:10 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by SourceTek, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 6/11/2024. (West, Angel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
13 13 order Extension of Time to File Thu 03/28 10:59 AM
TEXT ORDER granting12 Defendant SourceTek, Inc.'s Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Plead. Defendant SourceTek, Inc. has until May 31, 2024 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 3/28/2024. (jeb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 03/27 5:10 PM
Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Move or Plead by SourceTek, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 4/10/2024. (West, Angel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
11 11 order Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/26 5:47 PM
TEXT ORDER granting10 Defendant IR Labs, LLC's Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Plead. Defendant IR Labs, LLC has until May 31, 2024 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 3/26/2024. (jeb)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 03/26 4:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re7 Amended Complaint by IR Labs DE, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Millsap, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/11 2:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Taveras, Chad Lyons. SourceTek, Inc. served on 3/11/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (Simpson, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/01 1:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christian Taveras, Chad Lyons; IR Labs DE, LLC waiver served on 2/1/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (Simpson, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/26 2:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. All Defendants. Party Dakotah Menaugh (on behalf of herself and others similarly situated) terminated., filed by Chad Lyons, Christian Taveras.(Simpson, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/26 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Jackson Simpson on behalf of Dakotah Menaugh (Simpson, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/25 11:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dakotah Menaugh. IR Labs DE, LLC served on 1/16/2024, answer due 2/6/2024. (Simpson, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
4 4 notice Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Wed 01/03 9:39 AM
Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (nla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7.1 Packet
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
3 3 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/02 3:03 PM
TEXT ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William Jack Simpson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 1/2/2024. (btg)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Tue 01/02 2:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5335059 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Dakotah Menaugh. (Simpson, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/02 1:29 PM
COMPLAINT against IR LABS DE, LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 405, receipt number AIASDC-5334928., filed by Dakotah Menaugh. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/1/2024. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/1/2024 Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Timm