K3 Logistics, LLC v. Cryptotherm Manufacturing, Inc.
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David Counts |
Referred: | Ronald C Griffin |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-00001 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Jan 02, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 30, 2024 4:03 AM CDT |
Counter Defendant
Clayton Bush
|
|
Counter Defendant
K3 Logistics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
NGL Water Solutions Permian, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cryptotherm Manufacturing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
K3 Logistics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Plaintiff
Cryptotherm Manufacturing, Inc.
Terminated: 06/18/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
75 | 75
![]() ORDER GRANTING73 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David Counts. (kg) |