Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Referred: Ronald C Griffin
Case #: 7:24-cv-00001
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2024
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jun 30, 2024 4:03 AM CDT
Counter Defendant
Clayton Bush
Counter Defendant
K3 Logistics, LLC
Represented By
Bailey Corine Tulloch
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Matthew Justus Swantner
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Robert Moore Biedrzycki
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
NGL Water Solutions Permian, LLC
Represented By
Suzanna C. Bonham
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Eron F. Reid
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cryptotherm Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Austin Holmes
Holmes Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Trevor Clay Martin
Holmes Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
K3 Logistics, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Justus Swantner
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Robert Moore Biedrzycki
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Plaintiff
Cryptotherm Manufacturing, Inc.
Terminated: 06/18/2024
Represented By
Michael Austin Holmes
Holmes Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Trevor Clay Martin
Holmes Law Group, PLLC
contact info

GPO May 28 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 34 Motion to Dismiss filed by K3 Logistics, LLC. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3)
GPO Jun 18 2024
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 34 Motion to Dismiss filed by K3 Logistics, LLC, 38 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
GPO Jan 16 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 42 Motion for Default Judgment, filed by K3 Logistics, LLC. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3)
GPO Jan 31 2025
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 69 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
75 75 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Tue 04/01 4:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING73 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David Counts. (kg)
Related: [-]