Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jack Zouhary
Case #: 3:24-cv-00007
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2024
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jun 30, 2024 4:57 AM EDT
Counter-Claimant
Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Represented By
William M. Harter
Frost Brown Todd - Columbus
contact info
Natalie N. Mattingly
Frost Brown Todd - Columbus
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Venice Small
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Zilba
Law Office Of Jeffrey C. Zilba
contact info
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Represented By
William M. Harter
Frost Brown Todd - Columbus
contact info
Natalie N. Mattingly
Frost Brown Todd - Columbus
contact info
Plaintiff
Venice Small
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Zilba
Law Office Of Jeffrey C. Zilba
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
appeal Acknowledgment from the USCA Fri 04/18 4:08 PM
Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of68 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 25-3302 . Date filed in USCA 4/18/25. (H,SP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
68 68 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 04/17 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals as to66 Order, by Venice Small. Filing fee $ 605 not paid.(K,AR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope