Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:24-bk-40025
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jan 26, 2024

Debtor
Explorations Preparatory School, Inc.
2160 S Edmonds Ln
Lewisville, TX 75067-6138
Represented By
Michael S. Mitchell
Michael S. Mitchell
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Michelle Chow
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 16200 Addison Road, Suite 140
Addison, TX 75001
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 01/03/2024 12:03 AM CST
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
crditcrd none Tue 01/02 1:03 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, All Schedules & Statements (fee)-case upload([LINK 24-40025 ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13158871, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7, All Schedules & Statements [fee]-case upload Tue 01/02 1:03 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Schedules A-J, Statements, Matrix, and All Other Required Documents(Uploaded electronically). Filed by Michael S. Mitchell of Michael S. Mitchell on behalf of Explorations Preparatory School, Inc.. Document Due 1/9/2024. (Mitchell, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing Tue 01/02 1:05 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; and (3) the attorney will maintain the originally signed declaration for at least one year after final disposition of the case. Filed by Explorations Preparatory School, Inc. Related [+]. (Mitchell, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Schedules A-J, Statements, Matrix, and All Other Required Documents(Uploaded electronically). Filed by Michael S. Mitchell of Michael S. Mitchell on behalf of Explorations Preparatory School, Inc.. Document Due 1/9/2024. filed by Debtor Explorations Preparatory School, Inc.
3 3 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Tue 01/02 11:49 PM
341(a)
Related: [-]