Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Patricia D Barksdale
Case #: 3:24-cv-00009
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2024
Terminated:Jun 28, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 01, 2024 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Wipro Limited Corp
Represented By
Kaleigh Hartigan
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Matthew J. Hank
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Kaleigh McManus
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Natalie J. Storch
Littler Mendelson, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
David Freeman
Represented By
Andres Kroboth
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info
Noah E. Storch
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, July 01, 2024
44 44 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 07/01 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
43 43 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Report and Recommendations Fri 06/28 2:33 PM
ORDERED: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 41 ) is ADOPTED and CONFIRMED and made a part of this Order; the Joint Motion for Approval of Fair Labor Standards Act Settlement and Dismissal With Prejudice (Doc. 40 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to close this case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/28/2024. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/14 5:46 PM
NOTICE by Wipro Limited Corp re41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re40 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically FOR APPROVAL OF FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Wipro Limited Corp. JOINT - NON-OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
41 41 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 06/13 4:50 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending granting 40 the parties' motion for approval of the settlement agreement, dismissing the case with prejudice, and directing the clerk to close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 6/13/2024. (AMH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
40 40 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/22 4:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically FOR APPROVAL OF FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Wipro Limited Corp.(Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
39 39 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 05/21 2:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 38 the parties' third motion for an extension of time. The deadline to file the motion for approval of the settlement and the settlement agreement is extended to May 22, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on May 21, 2024. (AMH)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
38 38 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 05/20 5:06 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT (THIRD) by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
37 37 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 05/14 10:37 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 36 the parties' second motion for an extension of time. The deadline to file the motion for approval of the settlement and the settlement agreement is extended to May 20, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on May 14, 2024. (AMH)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
36 36 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 05/13 6:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
35 35 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 05/07 1:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 34 the joint motion for an extension of time. The parties must file their motion for approval of the settlement by May 13, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on May 7, 2024. (ASL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
34 34 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 05/06 5:42 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Approval of Settlement by David Freeman. (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of settlement Fri 04/26 2:47 PM
NOTICE of settlement JOINT by Wipro Limited Corp (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/11 2:19 PM
ORDER granting 31 the joint motion to conduct the settlement conference by remote means. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/11/2024. (AMH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/08 3:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically For Leave to Conduct Settlement Conference Remotely by David Freeman. (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
30 30 misc Verified summary Thu 03/21 4:35 PM
VERIFIED summary by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/28 1:44 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Wipro Limited Corp.(Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
28 28 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Wed 02/21 1:46 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:23 Case Management Scheduling Order by David Freeman. (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/20 6:35 PM
NOTICE by David Freeman re23 Case Management Scheduling Order of Filing Answers to Court Interrogatories (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
26 26 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 02/07 1:37 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kaleigh Hartigan Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 02/06 7:00 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wipro Limited Corp. Related case(s): No (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 02/06 6:54 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Natalie J. Storch on behalf of Wipro Limited Corp. Lead Counsel: Natalie J. Storch. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 02/06 5:06 PM
FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 2/6/2024. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/02 1:04 PM
ORDER granting 20 Matthew Hank's and 21 Kaleigh McManus's motions asking the Court for permission to specially appear to represent Wipro Limited Corp., in this action. By February 16, 2024, counsel must notify the Court who will be serving as lead counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on February 2, 2024. (AMH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/30 5:31 PM
Amended MOTION for Kaleigh McManus (f/k/a Kaleigh Hartigan) to appear pro hac vice Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21666289 - 1/17/24 by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/30 2:58 PM
Second MOTION for Matthew Hank to appear pro hac vice AMENDED by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/22 11:53 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c) 12 Kaleigh Hartigan's and 17 Matthew Hank's motions asking the Court for permission to specially appear to represent the defendant in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 1/19/2024. (ASL)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Mon 01/22 8:44 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time. The defendant must respond to the complaint by February 28, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on January 22, 2024. (AMH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/18 12:49 PM
Amended MOTION for Matthew Hank to appear pro hac vice Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21666216 for $150 by Wipro Limited Corp by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 01/18 9:43 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Matthew Hank, Kaleigh Hartigan Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations Wed 01/17 4:39 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/17/2024. (CKS)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/17 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wipro Limited Corp identifying Corporate Parent Wipro Limited for Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Wed 01/17 3:11 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/17 3:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Kaleigh Hartigan to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21666289 for $150 by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/17 2:57 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Matthew Hank to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21666216 for $150 by Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of appearance Wed 01/17 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie J. Storch on behalf of Wipro Limited Corp (Storch, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
9 9 order Order Wed 01/10 9:58 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2024. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
8 8 service Summons returned executed Tue 01/09 3:48 PM
RETURN of service executed on 01/08/2024 by David Freeman as to Wipro Limited Corp. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
7 7 service Summons issued Fri 01/05 10:35 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Wipro Limited Corp. (LNR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of appearance Thu 01/04 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andres Kroboth on behalf of David Freeman (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 01/04 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Andres Kroboth on behalf of David Freeman. Lead Counsel: Andres Kroboth. (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 01/04 3:56 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by David Freeman. Related case(s): No (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/04 3:55 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by David Freeman. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/04 10:37 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:24-cv-9-WWB-PDB. (JCG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/03 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Wipro Limited Corp with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21620067) filed by David Freeman.(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet