California Southern District Court
Judge:M James Lorenz
Referred: D Thomas Ferraro
Case #: 3:24-cv-00015
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1446dj Notice of Removal - Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2024
Terminated:May 24, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, San Diego County, 37-02023- 00052326-CU-BT-NC
Last checked: Monday Jul 01, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Acrisure of California, LLC
Represented By
Michael B. Barnett
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L. L. P.
contact info
Abigail Jean Hudson
Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info
Marc P. Miles
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-10
Plaintiff
Scott J. Tucker
Represented By
Aaron Joseph Schu
Paul, Plevin, Sullivan & Connaughton LLP
contact info
E. Joseph Connaughton, III
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 24, 2024
20 20 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Tue 05/28 10:44 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [ECF No.9 ] (Certified copy and docket sent to State Court via US Mail Service.). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/24/2024. (dim)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
19 19 order Order of Judge Transfer Wed 05/01 11:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge D. Thomas Ferraro for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24-cv-0015-L-DTF.(no document attached) (dim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
18 18 3 pgs respm Response - Other Thu 02/29 4:52 PM
RESPONSE re17 Response - Other Related [+] filed by Acrisure of California, LLC. (Hudson, Abigail)
Related: [-] sponses to Objections to Evidence in Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court
Monday, February 26, 2024
17 17 respm Response - Other Mon 02/26 5:06 PM
RESPONSE re15 Response in Opposition to Motion (Objections to Evidence in Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court) filed by Scott J. Tucker. (Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Reply - Other Mon 02/26 5:01 PM
REPLY - Other re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Scott J. Tucker.(Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Scott J. Tucker in Support of His Motion to Remand to State Court
Friday, February 16, 2024
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/16 5:50 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Acrisure of California, LLC.(Hudson, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration of Christopher Manoly,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 1
Monday, February 12, 2024
14 14 5 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/12 10:28 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to Michigan Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (objections to evidence and request to file a sur-reply) filed by Scott J. Tucker. (Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 02/08 11:23 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Michael B. Barnett Related [+]. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/8/2024.(jrd)
Related: [-] ECF No.12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
12 12 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/07 4:22 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Barnett, Michael) (rmc)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/07 3:51 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18567621.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Barnett, Michael) QC mail sent re missing signature (rmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
10 10 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 02/05 3:16 PM
RESPONSE in Support re5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to Michigan Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Acrisure of California, LLC.(Hudson, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Abigail Hudson,
Att: 2 Declaration of Christopher Manoly,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1
Friday, February 02, 2024
9 9 motion Remand to State Court Fri 02/02 5:34 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Scott J. Tucker.(Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 6 pgs Declaration of Scott J. Tucker
Monday, January 29, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/29 8:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scott J. Tucker. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Mon 01/29 8:03 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Scott J. Tucker . Identifying Other Affiliate Scott J. Tucker for Scott J. Tucker. (Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Response to Motion Mon 01/29 7:22 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to Michigan Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Scott J. Tucker.(Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Declaration of Scott J. Tucker ISO Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss Wed 01/10 4:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to Michigan Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Acrisure of California, LLC.(Hudson, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 17 pgs Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 4 pgs Declaration of Christopher Manoly,
Att: 3 Exhibit A
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Wed 01/03 6:13 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Acrisure of California, LLC (Hudson, Abigail)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/03 6:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acrisure of California, LLC. (Hudson, Abigail)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Certificate of Service Wed 01/03 4:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acrisure of California, LLC re1 Notice of Removal, (Hudson, Abigail)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Wed 01/03 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BCASDC-18469083.), filed by Acrisure of California, LLC. The new case number is 3:24-cv-15-L-BGS. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Declaration of Abigail Hudson,
Att: 3 33 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 3 pgs Declaration Christopher Manoly,
Att: 5 15 pgs Exhibit A