California Central District Court
Judge:William D Keller
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:23-cv-10864
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2023
Terminated:May 07, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 10, 2025
17 17 misc Mail Returned Mon 01/27 9:07 AM
Mail Returned addressed to Ezequiel Romo re R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations16 (hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
16 16 order R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations Thu 12/26 9:55 AM
ORDER: (1) ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; AND (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND OR ALTER JUDGMENT by Judge William D. Keller for MOTION to AMEND or Alter Judgment10 , Report and Recommendation13 . IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment Under Rule 59(e) is DENIED. (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
15 15 misc Mail Returned Tue 08/06 2:14 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Ezequiel Romo re Notice of Report and Recommendation12 (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
14 14 misc Mail Returned Thu 08/01 4:38 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Ezequiel Romo re Report and Recommendation13 (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
13 13 reportrecommend Report and Recommendation (Issued) Tue 07/09 5:19 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. Re10 MOTION to AMEND or Alter Judgment. (hr)
Related: [-]
12 12 reportrecommend Notice of Report and Recommendation Tue 07/09 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. Objections to R&R due by 7/29/2024. (hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report and Recommendation
Thursday, June 06, 2024
11 11 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 06/06 3:50 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION TO AMEND OR ALTER JUDGMENT RULE 59 (e)10 is hereby referred to the Magistrate Judge. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
10 10 motion Amend/Correct Alter Judgment Mon 05/20 4:31 PM
MOTION TO AMEND OR ALTER JUDGMENT RULE 59 (e)9 filed by Plaintiff Ezequiel Romo. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
9 9 order Dismissing Case Tue 05/07 4:14 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge William D. Keller: The Court previously received from Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) a Complaint/Petition/Notice of Removal without an accompanying IFP Request or payment of the filing fees. Accordingly, this case is HEREBY ORDERED: DISMISSED without prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
8 8 cs_rasgn Transferring Case (CV-29) Tue 03/19 10:39 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. ORDER case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr to the calendar of Judge William D. Keller for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-10864-WDK (PVC). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
7 7 order Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P) Tue 02/27 5:18 PM
ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Denying2 ,6 REQUEST to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee (Prisoner Non-Habeas Case) because Plaintiff has the ability to prepay the full filing fee. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff must do the following: Plaintiff must pay the full filing fee of $405. His account statement shows a current available balance of $1,848.81. If Plaintiff does not comply with these instructions within 30 days, this case will be DISMISSED without prejudice. (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
6 6 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P) Fri 02/23 1:29 PM
REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Ezequiel Romo. (hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
5 5 othcmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/15 1:26 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants amending Complaint1 , filed by Plaintiff Ezequiel Romo(hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
4 4 order Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P) Wed 01/17 9:09 AM
ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Postponing ruling on2 REQUEST to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee (Prisoner Non-Habeas Case), for 30 days so that Plaintiff has the opportunity to provide missing information. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff must file a certified copy of a trust fund statement for the six months prior to the date he filed the Complaint. Plaintiff also must file an Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff does not comply with these instructions within 30 days, this case will be DISMISSED without prejudice. See attached statement for details. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Wed 01/03 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P) Wed 01/03 11:30 AM
REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Ezequiel Romo. (ghap)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Prisoner Civil Rights) Wed 01/03 11:28 AM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Jairo Cisneros(individual), Jairo Cisneros(Jailhouse Informant, official capacity), City of Los Angeles, Jose Carlos Farias(individual), Jose Carlos Farias(Jailhouse Imformant Gang Expert, official capacity), Cynthia Jaldez(individual), Cynthia Jaldez(Co-Defendant, official capacity), James Killmore(individual), James Killmore(Detective Los Angeles Police Department, official capacity), Robert Luna, Robert Luna, Santos Martinez(individual), Santos Martinez(Jailhouse Informant, official capacity), Nidia Marisra Molina(Grand Jury Witness, official capacity), Nidia Marisra Molina(individual), Matthew Opuseth(Staff Writer Los Angeles Times, official capacity), Matthew Opuseth(individual), Joseph Santos Pech(individual), Joseph Santos Pech(Jailhouse Informant, official capacity), Eric W. Siddall(individual), Eric W. Siddall(Deputy District Attorney SBN 246599, official capacity) pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V Castillo., filed by plaintiff Ezequiel Romo. (ghap)
Related: [-]