Oregon District Court
Judge:Jolie A Russo
Case #: 3:23-cv-01979
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2024 3:10 AM PDT
Defendant
Milwaukie City Hall
Defendant
Clackamas County Jail
Defendant
John D. Wentworth
Defendant
Deputy Slinger
Defendant
Kyle Scott
Defendant
Oregon Department of Public Safety and Training
Defendant
Multnomah County Sheriff's Office
Defendant
Multnomah County
Defendant
Milwaukie Police Department Deputy Slinger
Defendant
Milwaukie Police Department
Defendant
Maryanne Meanie
Defendant
Stephen L. Madkour
Defendant
David Fooladjoush
Defendant
Alex Fletcher
Defendant
Andrew Elliot
Defendant
Clackamas Indigent Defense Corporation
Defendant
City Hall
Defendant
Angela Bradenburg
Plaintiff
Gordon Johnson
2525 N Williams Apt #24
Portland, OR 97227

GPO Mar 18 2024
ORDER: In accordance with Judge Russo's Order 4, all other claims are Dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is allowed thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Judge Russo's Order. Failure to file an amended complaint as ordered will result in the dismissal of all claims, outside of the claim based on the August 10th or 12th of 2023 incident, with prejudice. Signed on 3/18/24 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/18/24.) (gm)
GPO Jun 04 2024
ORDER: Plaintiff's amended complaint 11 is Dismissed in Part as stated herein. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, entitled "Second Amended Complaint," in accordance with this Order (i.e., alleging only claims premised on his August 2023 detention against Clackamas County "jail staff and Lieutenant [and] medical staff") within 30 days. Signed on 6/4/24 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 6/4/24.) (gm)
GPO Feb 21 2025
Findings & Recommendation: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 22, 23 & 41 should be granted. Wentworth, Brandenburg, Scott, Fooladjoush, Slinger, Vetto, Milwaukie Police Department, and Milwaukie City Hall should be dismissed as defendants from this lawsuit with prejudice. Any motion to amend the complaint in relation to plaintiff's 2023 detainment at Clackamas County Jail must be filed within 30 days of the District Judge's order. Signed on 2/21/25 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 2/21/25.) (gm)
GPO Mar 27 2025
ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation 44. Defendant John D. Wentworth's Motion to Dismiss 22; the City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 23; and the County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 41, are Granted. Plaintiff's claims against defendants John D. Wentworth, Milwaukie City Hall, Milwaukie Police Department, Angela Brandenburg, Kyle Scott, David Fooladjoush, Justin Slinger, Jane E. Vetto, and Clackamas County Jail are Dismissed with prejudice. Any motion to amend the complaint in relation to plaintiff's 2023 detainment at Clackamas County Jail must be filed within thirty days of this Order. Signed on 3/27/25 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/27/25.) (gm)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
51 51 order Order on Motion for Leave to File AmendedComplaint/Petition Mon 04/28 11:02 AM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint49 is Denied with leave to renew for failure to comply with the Local Rules. See Justice v. Rockwell Collins, Inc. , 117 F.Supp.3d 1119, 1132 n. 7 (D. Or. 2015), aff'd , 720 Fed.Appx. 365 (9th Cir. 2017) ("pro se plaintiffs must comply with the local rules") (citation and internal quotations omitted). Specifically, plaintiff's motion does not include a conferral statement consistent with LR 7-1(a), or describe the proposed changes and present a copy of the amended pleadings as required to LR 15-1(a) and LR 15-1(b), respectively, such that it is unclear what claims he is attempting to pursue and against which defendants. Any future motion to amend must comply with the Local Rules and be filed within 30 days. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/28/25.) (gm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
50 50 resp Response to Motion Fri 04/25 10:23 AM
Response to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition49 . Filed by John D. Wentworth. (Abrams, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
49 49 motion Amend Complaint/Petition Thu 04/24 3:25 PM
Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Filed by Gordon Johnson. (sb)
Related: [-]