Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:24-cv-00012
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Terminated:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 02, 2024 4:19 AM EDT
defendant
David Boysen
Represented By
Allan C. Vander Laan
Cummings Mcclorey Davis & Acho Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Kristen Lee Rewa
Cummings Mcclorey Davis & Acho Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Sydney Garner
Represented By
Allan C. Vander Laan
Cummings Mcclorey Davis & Acho Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Kristen Lee Rewa
Cummings Mcclorey Davis & Acho Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Kalamazoo Public Safety Department
Represented By
Allan C. Vander Laan
Cummings Mcclorey Davis & Acho Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Kristen Lee Rewa
Cummings Mcclorey Davis & Acho Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Mitchell Vorick
Represented By
Allan C. Vander Laan
Cummings Mcclorey Davis & Acho Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Kristen Lee Rewa
Cummings Mcclorey Davis & Acho Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Courtney Thomas
1112 Summit St.
Kalamazoo, MI 49006


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, August 15, 2024
utility Copies Mailed Thu 08/15 9:48 AM
Copy of Stipulation and Order29 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (jrg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
29 29 order Stipulation and Order Wed 08/14 1:22 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
28 28 service Proof of Service Tue 08/13 10:30 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick re PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal by defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick27 Related [+]
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
27 27 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Tue 08/13 10:29 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal by defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick Related [+]
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Tue 07/30 11:07 AM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be submitted by 8/27/2024; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
25 25 minutes Early Settlement Conference Tue 07/30 10:58 AM
MINUTES of early settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; case settled; order regarding dismissal documents to issue (Portions Digitally Recorded) (jln)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Tue 07/30 11:16 AM
Copy of Order Regarding Dismissal Papers26 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
24 24 service Proof of Service Mon 07/08 11:11 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick for Re-Notice of Taking Deposition of Plaintiff Related [+]
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
23 23 service Proof of Service Tue 06/25 1:12 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick for Notice of Taking Deposition of Plaintiff Related [+]
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
22 22 service Proof of Service Tue 06/18 2:20 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick for Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents Related [+]
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
Monday, June 17, 2024
21 21 misc Restricted Access Court Document Mon 06/17 10:03 AM
(RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Videoconference information for 7/30/2024 hearing [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Courtney Thomas, Mitchell Vorick only] (jln)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Mon 06/17 1:01 PM
Copy of Restricted Access Court Document21 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (pjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
20 20 service Proof of Service Fri 05/24 12:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Courtney Thomas for interrogatory questions (ems)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
19 19 service Proof of Service Fri 05/17 11:04 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick for Defendants' Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendants Related [+]
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
Thursday, April 11, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Rejecting Pleading Thu 04/11 8:43 AM
ORDER REJECTING Amended Complaint submitted by Courtney Thomas; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Document
utility Copies Mailed Thu 04/11 8:46 AM
Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading18 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
17 17 order Case Management Order Mon 03/18 10:44 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 9/10/2024; dispositive motions due by 10/10/2024; early settlement conference set for 7/30/2024 at 09:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; settlement conference set for 5/22/2025 at 09:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 6/16/2025 at 09:30 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 7/8/2025 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Mon 03/18 4:06 PM
Copy of Case Management Order17 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 Mon 03/11 1:49 PM
MINUTES of scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; case management order to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (jal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
15 15 service Proof of Service Thu 03/07 11:23 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick re Corrected Joint Status Report (Rule 16)14 , Notify Attorney Notice13 , Joint Status Report (Rule 16)12 Related [+] Modified text on 3/7/2024 (ems)
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
14 14 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Thu 03/07 11:15 AM
CORRECTED JOINT STATUS REPORT Related [+] Modified text on 3/7/2024; this entry replaces12 (ems)
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
13 13 misc Notify Attorney Notice Thu 03/07 8:50 AM
NOTICE to attorney Kristen Lee Rewa regarding recent filing12 (ems)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
12 12 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Wed 03/06 5:36 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT Related [+]
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
11 11 misc Restricted Access Court Document Tue 02/20 2:43 PM
(RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Conference call instructions for 3/11/2024 scheduling conference [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Courtney Thomas, Mitchell Vorick only] (jal)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Tue 02/20 2:41 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 3/11/2024 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; status report due by 3/6/2024; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Proof of Service Tue 02/20 1:05 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick re Answer to Complaint8 Related [+]
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/20 12:31 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick Related [+] Modified text on 2/20/2024 (mlc)
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
utility Copies Mailed Tue 02/20 3:31 PM
Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference10 , Restricted Access Court Document11 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed by USM (by personal service) Mon 02/12 9:45 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by US Marshal by personal service of summons and complaint upon Cpt. Diaz for Sydney Garner and Mitchell Vorick, and Julie Kelly for David Boysen and Kalamazoo Public Safety Department for David Boysen served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024; Sydney Garner served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024; Kalamazoo Public Safety Department served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024; Mitchell Vorick served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024 (ems)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
6 6 service Proof of Service Wed 02/07 4:20 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick re Attorney Appearance Related [+]
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 02/07 4:01 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kristen Lee Rewa on behalf of defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick Related [+]
Related: [-] wa, Kristen
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 02/07 4:36 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Allan C. Vander Laan on behalf of defendants David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick (Vander Laan, Allan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
service Summons Issued and Delivered to Marshal Mon 01/08 9:40 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick and delivered to US Marshal for service (ems)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 01/04 3:37 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/04 12:48 PM
ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Receipt of Case Notice Thu 01/04 12:23 PM
NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees Thu 01/04 12:23 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ems)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/04 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT against David Boysen, Sydney Garner, Kalamazoo Public Safety Department, Mitchell Vorick filed by Courtney Thomas (ems)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 01/04 12:25 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (ems)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 01/04 2:18 PM
Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis4 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (ems)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 01/04 3:41 PM
Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge5 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (ems)
Related: [-]