New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lashann Dearcy Hall
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:24-cv-00073
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 02, 2024 4:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Steven Madden, Ltd.
Represented By
Peter N Wang
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Christopher Albert Degennaro
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Sara Madavo
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gloria Brandes
Represented By
Adam H. Offenhartz
Baughman Kroup Bosse PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
utility Terminate Motions (filed in error) Fri 05/02 3:43 PM
Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly:75 Motion to Compel filed by Steven Madden, Ltd. This is not a motion, these are Exhibits. No further action is necessary, do not refile the document. (SGC)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal Fri 05/02 3:52 PM
ORDER granting88 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents under Seal. Counsel is directed to file the Exhibits under seal as a separate entry. Instructions on filing sealed documents on ECF are located at www.nyed.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 5/2/2025. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
91 91 misc Transcript Thu 05/01 2:54 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 30, 2025, before Judge Cho. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcriptions Plus II, Inc. Email address: rl.transcriptions2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 5/22/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2025. (LH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
minutes Discovery Hearing Wed 04/30 5:04 PM
Minute Entry for Discovery Conference proceedings held on 4/30/2025 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearances by Adam H. Offenhartz, Elizabeth Jooyoung Lee, and Gabriella L. Sternfeld for plaintiff Gloria Brandes ("Brandes" or "plaintiff"); Sara Madavo, Benjamin Ian Bassoff, and Peter N. Wang for defendant Steven Madden, Ltd. ("Madden" or "defendant"). The Court heard argument on plaintiff's motion for a protective order. See Dkts. 78-87. Plaintiff's motion taken under advisement. The parties continue to dispute the issues raised in defendant's Letter Motion for a Pre-Motion Conference (Dkts. 69, 71, 73). Madden maintains that Brandes has improperly withheld documents based on alleged attorney-client privilege and under the work product doctrine, and that Brandes has improperly redacted portions of recently-produced documents. Brandes' most recent privilege logs were filed at Dkts. 89-2 and 89-3. The parties dispute whether three categories of documents are protected by attorney-client privilege or the work product doctrine: (1) communications with Brandes' accounting firm; (2) communications with Brandes' former colleagues; and (3) pre-acquisition documents. By 5/6/2025 , parties shall meet and confer regarding these three categories of documents that remain in dispute. If the parties are unable to resolve their dispute, the parties shall file a joint letter identifying any issues and shall attach a list of the at-issue documents contained in Brandes' privilege log. Discussion regarding Madden's Rule 30(b)(6) notice to plaintiff. By 5/5/2025 , plaintiff shall advise Madden whether plaintiff will agree to serve as the 30(b)(6) witness on behalf of the at-issue sellers. By 5/6/2025 , Madden shall designate its Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses. If parties are unable to reach an agreement on the 30(b)(6) topics, by 5/6/2025, parties shall advise the Court. Plaintiff has agreed to produce the text messages of Katharine Brandes by 5/12/2025 . By 5/6/2025 , defendant shall provide plaintiff with a declaration regarding its preservation of text messages during the relevant time period. The parties shall continue to meet and confer regarding plaintiff's request that Madden produce its document retention policies for the relevant time period. A telephonic status conference will be held on 5/7/2025 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Parties should come to the conference prepared to discuss any pending discovery issues addressed in the parties' 5/6/2025 joint status report. Each party is directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 709-478-501# . Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. If any party has difficulty accessing the conference, please contact Chambers at 718-613-2110. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/30/2025. (FTR: 11:05- 1:06.) (THB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
90 90 misc Letter Tue 04/29 7:25 PM
Letter in response to Plaintiff's April 28, 2025 letter by Steven Madden, Ltd. (Madavo, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Monday, April 28, 2025
89 89 misc Letter Mon 04/28 8:38 PM
Letter regarding Outstanding Discovery by Steven Madden, Ltd. (Madavo, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Madden's Position Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Madden,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Madden,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Madden,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Madden,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Madden,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Madden,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Madden,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Madden,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Madden,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Madden,
Att: 12 Exhibit Brandes' Position Letter,
Att: 13 Exhibit 1 - Brandes,
Att: 14 Exhibit 2 - Brandes,
Att: 15 Exhibit 3 - Brandes,
Att: 16 Exhibit 4 - Brandes
88 88 motion Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal Mon 04/28 8:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Steven Madden, Ltd.. (Madavo, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B