Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:24-cv-00036
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
CauseRestrictions on Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Terminated:Jan 22, 2024
Case in other court:California Southern, 3:17-cv-01411
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 02, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Bank of America N.A.
Represented By
Sara F. Holladay-Tobias
Mcguirewoods, LLP
contact info
Monica L. Haddad Forbes
Mcguirewoods, LLP
contact info
Emily Yandle Rottmann
Mcguirewoods, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Represented By
Sundeep Singh Sidhu
Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
contact info
Robert E. Sickles
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Heller
Represented By
Amanda J. Allen
The Consumer Protection Firm, PLLC
contact info
William Peerce Howard
The Consumer Protection Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, January 22, 2024
41 41 order Order Mon 01/22 4:12 PM
TEXT ORDER. The parties have filed a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). (Doc. 40 ). The Stipulation is self-executing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC , 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and motions and close the file. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 1/22/2024. (RHG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/19 4:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jason Heller. (Howard, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
39 39 notice Notice of appearance Fri 01/12 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Sickles on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Sickles, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
38 38 transfer District Transfer In Thu 01/04 4:47 PM
TRANSFER IN from the Southern District of California (San Diego). Case assigned to District Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New Case Number: 8:24-cv-36-JLB-SPF. (AG)
Related: [-]
37 37 transfer Case transferred in - district transfer Thu 01/04 4:46 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:17-cv-01411. File received electronically
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
36 36 Case transferred to District of Middle District of Florida. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Middle District of Florida*.*401 West Central Boulevard, Suite 1200**Orlando, FL 32801* (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Conditional Remand Order MDL 2295
35 35 NOTICE: Case transferred to Middle District of Florida. The parties in this case failed to stipulate or designate the contents of the remanded record as directed in the Conditional Remand Order dated 12/8/23 filed in 11md2295-JAH(BGS). Pursuant to United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Rule 10.4(b), the record of this case is being transferred to the Middle District of Florida (their case no. 17-01190 per the Conditional Remand Order of MDL 2295. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jmo) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
34 34 Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying to Defendant's Motions to Exclude as Moot (Doc. Nos. 673, 850, 885). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 07/05/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cxl1) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
33 33 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re (850 in 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS) MOTION for Summary Judgment : Plaintiffs Shall File Responses by 7/13/2022. Defendant May File a Reply by 7/27/2022. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/24/2022.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(smy1) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
32 32 ORDER denying 813 application to conduct discovery. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/09/2021.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
31 31 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Defendant shall file a response to the motion on or before August 11, 2021. Plaintiffs may file a reply on or before August 18, 2021. The matter will be 11 deemed under submission at the time. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/28/2021.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
30 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Motion Hearing held on 5/26/2021 re (796 in 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS). Plaintiffs' motion to reopen discovery is Granted. The limited discovery permitted by this order must be completed on or before July 26, 2021. The parties shall file a joint status report regarding the status of discovery on or before July 17, 2021. The parties pending motions for summary judgment are withdrawn. The parties may file new motions for summary judgment following the close of the limited discovery(Court Reporter Juliet Eichenlaub). (Plaintiff Attorney Chris R. Miltenberger; Patric Lester). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Robbins, James Trefil). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (lao) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
29 29 ORDER lifting stay and setting hearing as telephonic. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/24/2021.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (dlg). [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
28 28 ORDER vacating hearing on 737 motion to stay set for 12/10/2018. The motion is taken under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/03/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 23, 2018
27 27 ORDER Vacating Hearing re 672 MOTION for Summary Judgment; 673 MOTION to Exclude; 674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/23/2018. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/23/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(mpl) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 04, 2018
26 26 ORDER rescheduling hearing on Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 672) and motion to exclude Plaintiffs expert (Doc. No. 673), and Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. No. 674) set for hearing on 8/20/2018, is vacated and rescheduled to 9/10/2018 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/04/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
25 25 ORDER rescheduling hearing and setting briefing schedule. The hearing on for Defendants motions set for 8/13/2018, is vacated and rescheduled to8/20/2018 at 2:30pm. The hearing on Plaintiffs motion set for 7/30/2018, is vacated and rescheduled to 8/20/2018 at 2:30pm. Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendants motion on or before 7/26/2018. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs motion on or before 6/26/2018. Any replies shall be filed on or before 7/17/2018. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/01/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
24 24 ORDER granting 668 Joint motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/23/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
23 23 ORDER approving time and expense submissions to Common Benefit Fund of Patric A. Lester (Doc No. 651) and Chris Miltenberger (Doc No. 652). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/29/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER approving submissions to Common Benefit Fund of Patric A. Lester (Doc No. 636) and Chris Miltenberger (Doc No. 637). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/29/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
21 21 PRETRIAL ORDER - The Member Cases are consolidated for pretrial purposes only. Any tag-along actions later filed in, removed to or transferred to this Court, or directly filed in the Southern District of California, will automatically be consolidated with this action without further motions or orders. This consolidation, however, does not constitute a determination that the actions should be consolidated for trial, nor does it have the effect of making any entity a party to any action in which he, she, or it has not been named, served, or added in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. All future filing will be done on the master docket 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 4/25/2012. (jpp) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2017
20 20 Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal assigned to transfer case from Middle District of Florida. (no document attached) (jjg) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
19 19 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:17-cv-01190. Original file received electronically (jjg) [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2017
18 18 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order (CTO-121) transferring case to: Southern District of California MDL case number: 2295 (BSN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
17 17 ORDER that all proceedings in this case are stayed pending final transfer of this case to MDL No. 2295. The clerk is directed to administratively close the case during the period of the stay, subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case in the event the JPML declines to transfer this case unconditionally. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/30/2017. (SKH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
16 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent PRA Group, Inc. for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC... (Sidhu, Sundeep) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
15 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC..(Sidhu, Sundeep) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2017
14 14 NOTICE by Bank of America, N.A. of Filing Motion to Transfer Pursuant to LR 1.04 (b)(Haddad Forbes, Monica) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion to Transfer
13 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Bank of America, N.A..(Haddad Forbes, Monica) Modified text on 6/27/2017 (KMM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bank of America, N.A.. Related case(s): y (Haddad Forbes, Monica) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica L. Haddad Forbes on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Haddad Forbes, Monica) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Yandle Rottmann on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Rottmann, Emily) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara F. Holladay-Tobias on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Holladay-Tobias, Sara) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
8 8 RETURN of service executed on June 6, 2017 by Jason Heller as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.. (Howard, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
7 7 RETURN of service executed on June 5, 2017 by Jason Heller as to Bank of America, N.A.. (Howard, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2017
6 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jason Heller. (Howard, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re4 Notice of designation of track per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jason Heller. Related case(s): no (Howard, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2017
4 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2017
3 3 SUMMONS issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.. (KMM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 SUMMONS issued as to Bank of America, N.A.. (KMM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA-43670) filed by Jason Heller.(KMM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/12/2017.] [Transferred from casd on 1/4/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet