Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:24-cv-00010
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Terminated:Feb 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 02, 2024 3:59 AM CDT
Defendant
Reliant Field Services, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen Craig Wilcox
Adams And Reese, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Holden Tanner
Represented By
William Clifton Alexander
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Lauren E. Braddy
contact info
Austin W. Anderson
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Carter T. Hastings
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
10 10 order Judgment Wed 02/14 5:17 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/14 5:16 PM
DISMISSAL ORDER--Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. A final judgment will follow pursuant to Rule 58. Defendants pending motion to dismiss (ECF No. 5) is hereby DISMISSED AS MOOT. Because no claims remain pending in this case, the Clerks office is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 02/13 5:27 PM
STIPULATION to Arbitration by Holden Tanner.(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
7 7 9 pgs order Order Wed 01/31 1:54 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY--It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) to submit (1) a proposed scheduling order and (2) a Rule 26(f) Report in the formats shown in the attached documents for the Courts consideration by February 28, 2024. Therefore, within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of thisOrder, each party shall sign the appropriate election form to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 01/30 3:05 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reliant Field Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Isramco, Inc. for Reliant Field Services, Inc.. (Wilcox, Stephen)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss Compel Tue 01/30 2:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Reliant Field Services, Inc..(Wilcox, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/23 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holden Tanner. Reliant Field Services, Inc. served on 1/9/2024, answer due 1/30/2024. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 01/08 11:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Reliant Field Services, Inc.. (bt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/04 3:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Holden Tanner. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/04 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18267622), filed by Holden Tanner.(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Holden Tanner Consent to Join,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/08 11:38 AM
Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bt)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Mon 01/08 11:38 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bt)
Related: [-]