Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-00002
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 05, 2024 1:24 AM CST
Defendant
Mercedes Marie Bradford (1)
Represented By
Justin Patrick Hill
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Elizabeth Maeve Bagwell
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/25/2025 5:54 PM CDT
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
Arrest of Mercedes Marie Bradford in Western District of Oklahoma. (cps)
Related: [-]
1 1 RULE 40 Documents Received as to Mercedes Marie Bradford (cps)
Related: [-]
2 2 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Mercedes Marie Bradford (ac)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Justin Patrick Hill for Mercedes Marie Bradford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/3/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Initial Appearance in Rule 40 as to Mercedes Marie Bradford held on 1/3/2024. Defendant remanded to custody of USMS. (ac)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 40 Hearings by Mercedes Marie Bradford (ac)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Mercedes Marie Bradford Bond Hearing set for 1/9/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/3/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
7 7 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Justin Patrick Hill appearing for Mercedes Marie Bradford (Hill, Justin)
Related: [-]