New Hampshire District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00110
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2023
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 05, 2024 2:30 AM EST
Defendant
Robin Nichols (1)
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Levin
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info
Brian M. Quirk
Shaheen & Gordon
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Geoffrey W. R. Ward
Us Attorney'S Office (nh)
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/28/2024 3:27 AM EST
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
ENDORSED ORDER granting 3 MOTION TO SEAL AT LEVEL II: INDICTMENT, ARREST WARRANT, THIS MOTION, & DOCKET TEXT ENTRIES as to Robin Nichols (1). Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. (jwb)
Related: [-]
Arrest Warrant Issued as to Robin Nichols. Original warrant and copies to US Marshal and US Probation.(jwb)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to Robin Nichols (1) count(s) 1, 2. Original document available in clerk's office.(jwb)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION TO SEAL AT LEVEL II:INDICTMENT, ARREST WARRANT, THIS MOTION, & DOCKET TEXT ENTRIES until defendant is taken into custody by USA as to Robin Nichols. Motions referred to Talesha L. Saint-Marc. (jwb)
Related: [-]
4 4 Praecipe for Warrant by USA as to Robin Nichols. (jwb)
Related: [-]