Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Sim Lake
Case #: 4:24-cv-00040
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 3:39 AM CDT
Conflict Check Party
Foley Lardner LLP
Conflict Check Party
Relay Financial Technologies, Inc.
Conflict Check Party
Thread Bancorp, Inc.
Conflict Check Party
Wealth Assistants LLC
Represented By
Lema Mousilli
Lloyd Mousilli PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Thread Bank
Represented By
Matthew Q. Verdin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Intervenor
John Bustamante
Represented By
Nico Banks
contact info
Joshua Richard Stein
contact info
Intervenor
John Moore
Represented By
Nico Banks
contact info
Joshua Richard Stein
contact info
Intervenor
Steven Paul
Represented By
Nico Banks
contact info
Joshua Richard Stein
contact info
Intervenor
Christopher Tawil
Represented By
Nico Banks
contact info
Joshua Richard Stein
contact info
Intervenor
Michael Whitten
Represented By
Nico Banks
contact info
Joshua Richard Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Wealth Assistants LLC
Represented By
Lema Mousilli
Lloyd Mousilli PLLC
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, granting 12 AMENDED 6 MOTION to Intervene by John Paul Bustamante, Steven Paul, Michael Whitten, John Moore and Christopher Tawil. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (jld4)
GPO Jun 13 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - For the reasons stated above in § II.B, Wealth Assistants LLC is ORDERED to arbitrate with Thread Bank the claims asserted in this action. For the reasons stated above in § II.C, the claims that Wealth Assistants LLC has asserted against Thread Bank are STAYED pending notification from the parties that the arbitration process has been completed. Wealth Assistants LLC and Thread Bank are required to submit a status report on August 30, 2024, and every sixty (60) days thereafter. Defendant Thread Bank's 26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration is GRANTED. The claims that the Intervenors have asserted against Wealth Assistants LLC are not stayed. (Status Report due by 8/30/2024 and every sixty (60) days thereafter) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (sra4)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.