California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:24-cv-00100
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Terminated:Feb 26, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV28907
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 02, 2024 1:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Leslies Poolmart, Inc.
Represented By
Emma Moralyan
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Peter Zlomke Stockburger
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebekah Rodriguez
Represented By
Scott J Ferrell
Pacific Trial Attorneys Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 26, 2024
16 16 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 02/26 12:44 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER MOVING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR PENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court, having received the Notice of Settlement, filed February 26, 2024, vacates all previously set dates. The Court moves the matter to the inactive calendar pending finalization of settlement. The parties shall proceed with the settlement as outlined in the notice. Should the settlement not be finalized within the designated time, the parties shall notify the Court, in writing, and request that the matter be restored to the active calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (aco)
Related: [-]
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 02/26 10:49 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: In light of the settlement, the initial status conference scheduled for February 26, 2024 is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
14 14 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 02/26 9:52 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 3:00 p.m. has been advanced to 2:00 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 02/26 9:06 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Rebekah Rodriguez. Dismissal is With Prejudice to Plaintiff, Without Prejudice to the Putative Class. (Ferrell, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
12 12 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Fri 02/09 4:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Leslie's Poolmart, Inc. to respond to the Complaint in this case shall be extended to March 11, 2024. No further extensions will be granted. RE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer,11 . (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Mon 02/05 10:00 AM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 11, 2024 re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)9 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendant Leslies Poolmart, Inc..(Moralyan, Emma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 01/10 1:14 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 2/26/2024 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
9 9 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 01/10 10:24 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Leslies Poolmart, Inc. answer now due 2/9/2024, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Leslies Poolmart, Inc..(Moralyan, Emma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 01/09 9:27 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 01/09 9:27 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 01/09 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
5 5 misc Declaration Fri 01/05 5:28 PM
DECLARATION of Frederick Kalve re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendant Leslie's Poolmart, Inc.. (Moralyan, Emma)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Fri 01/05 5:27 PM
DECLARATION of Scott Song re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendant Leslie's Poolmart, Inc.. (Moralyan, Emma)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 01/05 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Leslie's Poolmart, Inc., identifying Leslie's Inc., AXA XL Insurance and Beazley USA. (Moralyan, Emma)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 01/05 5:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Leslie's Poolmart, Inc.. (Moralyan, Emma)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 01/05 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23STCV28907 Receipt No: ACACDC-36681447 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Leslie's Poolmart, Inc.. (Attorney Emma Moralyan added to party Leslie's Poolmart, Inc.(pty:dft))(Moralyan, Emma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit Class Action Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Superior Court Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit Superior Court Notice of Case Assignment,
Att: 5 Exhibit Superior Court Initial Status Conference Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit Superior Court Minute Order,
Att: 7 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 01/09 10:05 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendant Leslies Poolmart, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Rebekah Rodriguez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 111/27/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 01/09 10:09 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Rebekah Rodriguez, upon Defendant Leslies Poolmart, Inc. served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alex Jenkins, Authorized Person for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/13/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]