Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Margaret R Guzman
Case #: 4:24-cv-40003
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Airline Crash
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Terminated:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Forza Management Company
163 Auburn Street
Aburn, MA 01501
Represented By
John W. Moran
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Latraverse
15 Eagle Drive
Sutton, MA 01590
Represented By
David H. Rich
Todd & Weld
contact info
Plaintiff
Preferred Mutual Insurance Company
as subrogee of Marc Curtis One Preferred Way
New Berlin, NY 13411
Represented By
Matthew W. Perkins
Lecomte, Emanuelson & Doyle
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Barry R. Lundgren
Terminated: 04/24/2024
Represented By
John W. Moran
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, December 13, 2024
31 31 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Fri 12/13 9:21 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Rescheduling Tue 11/12 1:53 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Status Conference set for 12/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester Related [+] before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-] mote only
Monday, September 09, 2024
order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 09/09 11:04 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. Kevin Latraverse terminated. (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/06 11:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Kevin LaTraverse by Preferred Mutual Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
28 28 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/14 12:04 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/5/2024 02:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester Related [+] before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2024. Fat Discovery to be completed by 11/30/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2025.(Castles, Martin)
Related: [-] mote only
27 27 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 05/14 11:54 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: Scheduling Conference held on 5/14/2024, Case called, Counsel appear by video-conference for scheduling conference, Court adopts parties proposed scheduling order deadlines, Scheduling order to issue, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Perkins/Moran/Rich) (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
26 26 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Mon 05/13 4:38 PM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 for Forza Management Company . (Moran, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
25 25 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Fri 05/10 10:24 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
24 24 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Fri 05/10 8:53 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Rich, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
23 23 misc Joint statement re scheduling conference Thu 05/09 1:54 PM
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/24 3:54 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Wed 04/24 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester Related [+] before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-] mote only
Monday, April 22, 2024
20 20 misc Stipulation Mon 04/22 10:06 AM
STIPULATION re14 Memorandum in Support of Motion,1 Complaint,13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Re: Dismissal of Count V by Preferred Mutual Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Fri 04/12 11:02 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot7 Motion for Entry of Default and finding as moot8 Motion for Entry of Default. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/12 11:00 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 4/19/2024. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/11 12:17 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 04/19/24 to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Preferred Mutual Insurance Company.(Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 04/11 8:45 AM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint by Kevin Latraverse.(Rich, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 03/27 3:36 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint by Forza Management Company.(Moran, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 03/27 3:27 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barry R. Lundgren. (Moran, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 03/27 3:23 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Barry R. Lundgren.(Moran, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
12 12 service Summons Issued Mon 03/25 12:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Kevin Latraverse. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/13 10:49 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Preferred Mutual Insurance Company.(Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 29, 2024
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/29 5:29 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Forza Management Company. (Moran, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/29 9:08 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Forza Management Company, Barry R. Lundgren.(Moran, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
8 8 motion Default Judgment Fri 02/23 1:59 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Barry R. Lundgren by Preferred Mutual Insurance Company.(Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit affidavit in support of default
7 7 motion Default Judgment Fri 02/23 1:58 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Forza Management Company by Preferred Mutual Insurance Company.(Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/22 11:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Forza Management Company served on 1/16/2024, answer due 2/6/2024. (Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/12 12:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Barry R. Lundgren served on 1/9/2024, answer due 1/30/2024. (Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/05 4:36 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barrows, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 01/05 4:35 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Barrows, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/05 11:47 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Preferred Mutual Insurance Company. (Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/05 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10205626 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Preferred Mutual Insurance Company.(Perkins, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Form Category Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet