Colorado District Court
Judge:Charlotte N Sweeney
Referred: Richard T Gurley
Case #: 1:24-cv-00027
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 2:23 AM MDT
Defendant
Jonathan Godin
Represented By
Michelle Lynn Harden
Messner Reeves LLP
contact info
Matthew W. George
Messner Reeves LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wade Ceola
Represented By
John J. Astuno, Jr.
John Astuno, Jr., LLC
contact info
Brian David Malkmus
Malkmus Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
26 26 order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 11/12 11:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to25 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and fees. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 11/12/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Stipulation Tue 11/12 10:04 AM
STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Defendant Jonathan Godin.(George, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Re: Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
24 24 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Tue 09/10 3:23 PM
Reassigning Magistrate Judge. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) and with approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley in the referral capacity. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-00027-CNS-RTG. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 08/21 10:19 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 21 August 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for a Mutual Extension of Time with Respect to Disclosure of Expert Testimony/Modification of Scheduling Order21 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order is amended to reflect the following deadlines: Plaintiff's Affirmative Expert Disclosure Deadline December 1, 2024 ; Defendant's Expert Disclosure Deadline December 31, 2024 ; Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline February 1, 2025 .(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
22 22 order Memorandum Tue 08/20 3:04 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Expert Testimony/Modification of Scheduling Order. Motion21 is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 8/20/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Extension of Time Tue 08/20 12:11 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose Expert Testimony/Modification of Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Wade Ceola. (Astuno, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
20 20 order Minute Order Tue 04/23 1:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER: A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/10/2025 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. The parties' Proposed Final Pretrial Order is due by 7/3/2025. In addition to filing, the parties are directed to email the proposed order in editable format to Sweeney_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 4/23/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/19 11:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/3/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2025.By Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on April 19, 2024. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 04/19 11:55 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella: Scheduling Conference held on 4/19/2024. FTR: Courtroom C204. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/16 2:07 PM
PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 4/15/2024. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
16 16 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 04/12 3:05 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Wade Ceola. (Astuno, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
15 15 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 04/05 3:35 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 4/5/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 04/05 1:57 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 5 April 2024. This case was assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c). The signed Consent/Non-Consent Form13 indicates that at least one party has declined to consent. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigne d to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). Case randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings shall be designated as: 24-cv-00027-CNS. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Fri 04/05 11:11 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Wade Ceola All parties do not consent.. (Astuno, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/11 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Commencement of Action to Corvel Healthcare Corporation by Plaintiff Wade Ceola(Astuno, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service upon Corvel Healthcare Corporation 02/22/2024
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 02/28 7:13 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian David Malkmus on behalf of Wade CeolaAttorney Brian David Malkmus added to party Wade Ceola(pty:pla) (Malkmus, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 02/16 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Michelle L. Harden, Esq. by Michelle Lynn Harden on behalf of Jonathan GodinAttorney Michelle Lynn Harden added to party Jonathan Godin(pty:dft) (Harden, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/15 11:41 PM
Defendant Jonathan Godin, M.D.'s ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Jury Demand Attorney Matthew W. George added to party Jonathan Godin(pty:dft) by Jonathan Godin.(George, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
8 8 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Tue 02/13 8:34 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re:7 Certificate filed by attorney John J. Astuno, Jr. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a complete signature block to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate (Miscellaneous) Mon 02/12 2:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Review as to Defendant Jonathan Godin, M.D. by Plaintiff Wade Ceola. (Astuno, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Fri 01/26 1:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wade Ceola. Jonathan Godin waiver sent on 1/25/2024, answer due 3/25/2024. (Astuno, John)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 06, 2024
5 5 4 pgs order Order Mon 01/08 9:55 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 6 January 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/12/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document
4 4 order Minute Order Sat 01/06 12:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3] is April 5, 2024. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 1/6/2024. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 01/05 10:15 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 01/05 10:14 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/05 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT Complaint and Jury Demand against Jonathan Godin (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9472271)Attorney John J. Astuno, Jr added to party Wade Ceola(pty:pla), filed by Wade Ceola.(Astuno, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet