Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10015

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John P Mastando III
Case #: 1:24-bk-10016
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Dismissed:Oct 10, 2024
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Neo Image Enterprises, LLC
250 Lafayette St Fl 5
New York, NY 10012-4040
Represented By
Ilevu Yakubov
Jacobs PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, November 14, 2024
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 11/14 10:10 AM
Case Closed. (Cappiello, Karen)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 12, 2024
32 32 misc Certificate of Mailing - Order to Dismiss Sun 10/13 12:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order to Dismiss Related [+] . Notice Date 10/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #31 )
Thursday, October 10, 2024
31 31 order Order, Dismiss Thu 10/10 12:17 PM
Order signed on 10/10/2024 Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b) Dismissing Chapter 11 Cases. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
30 30 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 08/02 2:55 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10016 for the Month Ending: 06/30/2024 Filed by Robert M. Sasloff on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 08/02 2:53 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10016 for the Month Ending: 05/31/2024 Filed by Robert M. Sasloff on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
28 28 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 05/31 3:50 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10016 for the Month Ending: 04/30/2024 Filed by Robert M. Sasloff on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 05/31 3:49 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10016 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Robert M. Sasloff on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 05/31 3:48 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10016 for the Month Ending: 02/28/2024 Filed by Robert M. Sasloff on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 05/31 3:47 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10016 for the Month Ending: 01/31/2024 Filed by Robert M. Sasloff on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
24 24 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 03/26 11:31 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Vincent S Wong on behalf of Evergreen America Inc.. (Wong, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
23 23 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney For Debtor (Rule 2016(b)) - Form 2030 Wed 03/13 4:40 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney For Debtor (Rule 2016(b))- Form 2030 Filed by Ilevu Yakubov on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Yakubov, Ilevu)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
22 22 order Motion, Joint Administration Fri 02/09 12:49 PM
Order signed on 2/9/2024 Directing Joint Administration Of Chapter 11 Cases And Related Relief Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 20
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Fri 02/09 12:54 PM
Case Joint Administration: An order has been entered in this case, directing the joint administration of this case with the case of New Tent, LLC, Case No. 24-10015 jpm. All original pleadings shall be made in the case of New Tent, LLC, Case No. 24-10015 jpm. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 02/07 10:14 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated Related [+]. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
21 21 37 pgs misc Schedules Tue 02/06 5:40 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Robert M. Sasloff on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Motion, Joint Administration Tue 02/06 5:09 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Robert M. Sasloff on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order
19 19 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Tue 02/06 4:35 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Initial Case Conference Related [+] filed by Robert M. Sasloff on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/20/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (JPM) (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-] lated to Doc 5
Monday, February 05, 2024
18 18 notice Notice, Appearance Mon 02/05 1:26 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan S. Bodner on behalf of Milestone Construction Corp.. (Bodner, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
17 17 order Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Fri 01/19 1:05 PM
Order signed on 1/19/2024 Granting Debtors' Motion Seeking An Order Extending Their Time to File Their Schedules And Statements in These Cases. Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, January 18, 2024
16 16 motion Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Thu 01/18 5:35 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information /Corrected Motion filed by Robert M. Sasloff on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Thu 01/18 4:52 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information filed by Robert M. Sasloff on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Sasloff, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Order
14 14 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/18 4:23 PM
Order signed on 1/18/2024 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Re: Christina Sanfelippo, Esq. Related [+] . (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 11
13 13 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/18 4:13 PM
Order signed on 1/18/2024 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Re: Peter J. Roberts, Esq. Related [+] . (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 10
12 12 misc Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Thu 01/18 2:15 PM
Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Filed by Ilevu Yakubov on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Yakubov, Ilevu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
11 11 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Wed 01/17 3:23 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christina Sanfelippo, Esq filed by Frederick E. Schmidt on behalf of Shanghai Commercial Bank Ltd., New York Branch, The Shanghai Commercial and Savings Bank. (Schmidt, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Wed 01/17 3:08 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Peter J. Roberts on behalf of Shanghai Commercial Bank Ltd., New York Branch, The Shanghai Commercial and Savings Bank. (Roberts, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 notice Notice, Appearance Wed 01/17 2:42 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice and Pleadings filed by Frederick E. Schmidt on behalf of The Shanghai Commercial and Savings Bank, Shanghai Commercial Bank Ltd., New York Branch. (Schmidt, Frederick)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 01/17 3:09 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 24-10016 jpm] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16482133. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #10
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 01/17 3:24 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 24-10016 jpm] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16482191. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #11
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
8 8 notice Notice, Meeting of Creditors Tue 01/16 9:14 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors /INSTRUCTIONS FOR TELEPHONIC SECTION 341 MEETING OF CREDITORS Related [+] filed by Mark Bruh on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/12/2024 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Bruh, Mark)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, January 12, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Sat 01/13 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 01/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #4 )
6 6 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors - Official Forms 104/204 Fri 01/12 11:32 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Official Form 204) Filed by Ilevu Yakubov on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Yakubov, Ilevu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/11 4:39 PM
Order signed on 1/11/2024 Scheduling Initial Case Conference. With Hearing to be Held on 2/6/2024 at 09:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (JPM) (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
4 4 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Wed 01/10 9:28 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/12/2024 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Tue 01/09 2:45 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Tue 01/09 2:48 PM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A/B due 1/19/2024. Schedule D due 1/19/2024. Schedule E/F due 1/19/2024. Schedule G due 1/19/2024. Schedule H due 1/19/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 1/19/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/19/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors DUE at Time of Filing. Declaration of Schedules due 1/19/2024. List of all creditors DUE at Time of Filing. List of Equity Security Holders due 1/19/2024. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit DUE at Time of Filing. Corporate Ownership Statement DUE at Time of Filing. Incomplete Filings due by 1/19/2024, (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
3 3 notice Notice, Appearance Mon 01/08 9:29 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Aaron Slavutin on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Slavutin, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
2 2 misc Matrix Fri 01/05 2:17 PM
Matrix Filed by Ilevu Yakubov on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Yakubov, Ilevu)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 01/05 1:48 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 01/19/2024. Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing For Bankruptcy Under Chapter 11 - Form 201A due 01/19/2024. Schedule A/B due 01/19/2024. Schedule C due 01/19/2024. Schedule D due 01/19/2024. Schedule E/F due 01/19/2024. Schedule G due 01/19/2024. Schedule H due 01/19/2024. Schedule I due 01/19/2024. Schedule J due 01/19/2024. Schedule J-2 due 01/19/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 01/19/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/19/2024. Atty Disclosure State. due 01/19/2024. Statement of Operations Due: 01/19/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 01/19/2024. Balance Sheet Due Date:01/19/2024. Employee Income Record Due: 01/19/2024. Cash Flow Statement Due:01/19/2024. Declaration of Schedules due 01/19/2024. Attorney Signature On Petition due 01/19/2024. Pro Se Debtor Signature On Petition due 01/19/2024. Authorized Representative of Debtor Signature on Petition Form 201 due 01/19/2024. Debtor 342B Signature On Petition due 01/19/2024. Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration and Signature Form 119 due 01/19/2024. List of all creditors due 01/19/2024. List of All Creditors Required on Case Docket in PDF Format due 01/19/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 01/19/2024. Federal Income Tax Return Date: 01/19/2024 Record of Interest in Education Individual Retirement Account Due: 01/19/2024. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 01/19/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement due by: 01/19/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 01/19/2024, Chapter 11 Plan due by 5/6/2024, Disclosure Statement due by 5/6/2024, Initial Case Conference due by 2/5/2024, Filed by Ilevu Yakubov of Jacobs PC on behalf of Neo Image Enterprises, LLC. (Yakubov, Ilevu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Corporate Resolution
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 01/05 1:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10016 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16470443. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Fri 01/05 2:09 PM
Judge John P. Mastando III added to the case. (Harris, Kendra)
Related: [-]