Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Algenon L Marbley
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:24-cv-00047
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Dave Yost
in his official capacity as Ohio Attorney General Attorney General of Ohio 30 East Broad St., 17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Julie M Pfeiffer
Ohio Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Elizabeth Hanning Smith
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
James Parker Reising
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Phillip Thomas Kelly
Gallagher Sharp LLP
contact info
Stephen P. Tabatowski
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
NetChoice, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Huntley Rice
Sperling & Slater P.C.
contact info
Michael C. Cotton
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
contact info
Steven P. Lehotsky
Lehotsky Keller Cohn, LLP
contact info
Jeremy Evan Maltz
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
contact info
Scott Allen Keller
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
contact info
Joshua P. Morrow
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
contact info
Jared Bryans Magnuson
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
contact info
Alexis Swartz
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 12 2024
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant, Attorney General Yost. Defendant remains ENJOINED from implementing and enforcing the Act against Plaintiff or its member organizations. The bond posted by NetChoice following entry of the Temporary Restraining Order remains in place. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/12/2024. (cw)
GPO Apr 16 2025
Opinion and Order DENYING 42 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction. Signed by District Judge Algenon L Marbley on 4/16/2025. (dms)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
57 57 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 04/16 12:06 PM
Judgment is entered pursuant to the Opinion and Order entered on April 16, 2025. (dms)
Related: [-]
56 56 49 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 04/16 12:00 PM
Opinion and Order DENYING42 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING43 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction. Signed by District Judge Algenon L Marbley on 4/16/2025. (dms)
Related: [-]