Texas Western District Court
Judge:Elizabeth S Chestney
Case #: 5:24-cv-00021
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Terminated:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 3:53 AM CDT
Defendant
Jamella L Lee
Represented By
Brandon Taylor Cook
Gunn Lee & Cave, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marie Ferdinand Foundation
Represented By
Leigh McMillan Williams
Leigh M. Williams Law Office, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, January 10, 2025
32 32 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/13 4:46 PM
CASE CLOSING ORDER--Before the Court in the above-styled cause of action is the parties Joint Stipulation of Dismissal [#30], by which Plaintiff and Defendant stipulate to the dismissal of this action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is CLOSED.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
31 31 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Fri 01/10 10:45 AM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bt)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/09 1:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Jamella L Lee.(Cook, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 12/10 2:41 PM
ORDER --IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties file a stipulation of dismissal on or before January 9, 2025.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all current deadlines and settings are VACATED in light of the settlement.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 12/09 3:46 PM
ORDER CANCELLING MEDIATION--In light of the parties Joint Notice of Settlement and Request for Stay (Docket Entry 27)filed on todays date, it is hereby ORDERED that the mediation on December 12, 2024, is CANCELLED. The parties are excused on appearing on that date. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice Mon 12/09 3:34 PM
NOTICE JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR STAY by Jamella L Lee re26 Order, Set Hearings(Cook, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 24, 2024
26 26 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 10/25 2:17 PM
VIDEO MEDIATION ORDER, (Video Mediation Hearing set for 12/12/2024 9:30 AM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/24 9:20 AM
ORDER GRANTING24 Motion Requesting Mediation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad for mediation. Judge Bemporads chambers will provide the parties with a date for the mediation and instructions for preparing their mediation statements and other premeditation filings. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to ADR/Mediation Thu 10/24 9:21 AM
CASE REFERRED to ADR/Mediation. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/18 3:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION REQUESTING MEDIATION WITH A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jamella L Lee.(Cook, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 15, 2024
23 23 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 08/16 11:32 AM
ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL, (Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2025 9:30 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (mgr)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Status Conference Thu 08/15 3:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney: Zoom Status Conference held on 8/15/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(mgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 08/14 11:04 AM
ORDER RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, ( Status Conference set for 8/15/2024 2:00 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 08/08 9:46 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE ( Status Conference set for 8/15/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
19 19 minutes Status Conference Wed 08/07 2:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney: Zoom Status Conference held on 8/6/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 07/12 10:01 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, ( Status Conference set for 8/6/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Thu 07/11 12:43 PM
TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/11 12:42 PM
Case assigned to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Judge Xavier Rodriguez no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
16 16 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Wed 07/10 5:13 PM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Marie Ferdinand Foundation. (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Wed 07/10 3:39 PM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Jamella L Lee. (Cook, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 07/01 10:40 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCEAND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS, (Status Conference set for 8/8/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/01 10:38 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 6/30/2025 9:00 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 1/23/2025, ADR Mediation Completed by 1/23/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2024, Discovery due by 12/9/2024, Motions due by 1/23/2025,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
12 12 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 06/28 5:06 PM
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order with Agreed Rule 26 Report by Marie Ferdinand Foundation.(Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Rule 26 Schedule
Monday, June 10, 2024
11 11 9 pgs order Order Mon 06/10 4:22 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY--It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) to submit (1) a proposed scheduling order and (2) a Rule 26(f) Report in the formatsshown in the attached documents for the Courts consideration by June 28, 2024. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
10 10 misc Advisory to the Court Fri 05/17 2:06 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Jamella L Lee .(Cook, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Waiver Request,
Att: 2 Exhibit Email Returning Signed Waiver
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/17 2:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Brandon Taylor Cook added to party Jamella L Lee(pty:dft) by Jamella L Lee.(Cook, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
8 8 notice Notice Thu 04/25 4:53 PM
NOTICE Intent to Serve Non-Party Subpoena by Marie Ferdinand Foundation(Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/25 4:00 PM
Text Order GRANTING7 Motion for Extension of Time entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiff's deadline to serve Defendant is hereby extended to June 14, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (TElc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/22 2:00 PM
MOTION to Deem Served or to Enlarge Time for Service by Marie Ferdinand Foundation. (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/11 9:33 AM
Text Order GRANTING6 Motion to Extend Time entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Plaintiff to serve Defendant is hereby extended to May 1, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (TElc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/10 11:34 AM
MOTION to enlarge time to serve Jamella Lee re5 Summons Issued by Marie Ferdinand Foundation. (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 02/26 10:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Jamella L Lee. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
4 4 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/23 4:33 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Marie Ferdinand Foundation. (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
2 2 4 pgs notice Notice of Filing Thu 01/11 7:26 PM
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Intent to Serve Non-Party Subpoena for Records by Marie Ferdinand Foundation (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
3 3 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Wed 01/17 4:39 PM
Report on Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mgr)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/05 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18271760). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Marie Ferdinand Foundation.(Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/09 4:05 PM
Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Tue 01/09 4:07 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
Related: [-]