New York Southern District Court
Judge:Colleen Mcmahon
Case #: 1:24-cv-00101
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Terminated:Jun 27, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Justin Rojas
Represented By
Jacqueline R Guesno
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info
Artemio Guerra
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info
Meredith Munro
Munro Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BDO USA, P.C.
Represented By
Michael Elias Berman
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Wed 10/09 4:50 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of Colorado acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:24-cv-02793, filed on 10/9/2024. (vba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
notice Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/29 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
29 29 21 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Thu 08/08 4:32 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION denying25 Motion for Reconsideration. For the reasons discussed above, the motion for reconsideration is DENIED. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. It is a written opinion. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at Docket Number 25. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/8/24) BY ECF TO ALL COUNSEL. (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 07/19 1:56 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re:25 MOTION for Reconsideration re;24 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, . . Document filed by Justin Rojas..(Guesno, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
27 27 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 07/09 3:18 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:26 Letter filed by Justin Rojas. ENDORSEMENT: Please file a response to the motion by July 19. Thank you. ( Responses due by 7/19/2024) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/9/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
26 26 misc Letter Mon 07/08 4:32 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jacqueline Guesno dated 7/8/24 re: Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Justin Rojas..(Guesno, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
25 25 motion Reconsideration Fri 07/05 7:28 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re;24 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, . Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Berman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in support of Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Thursday, June 27, 2024
24 24 26 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 06/27 5:04 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER granting14 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth above, Defendant's motion to transfer to the District of Colorado is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Dkt. No. 14 and transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/27/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/03 6:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Colorado . . Document filed by Justin Rojas..(Guesno, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/26 4:21 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Colorado - Unopposed addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jacqueline Guesno dated 03/26/2024. Document filed by Justin Rojas..(Guesno, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
21 21 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/20 8:51 PM
DECLARATION of Scott Grimm in Opposition re:14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Colorado .. Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Berman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - [Redacted],
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - [Redacted],
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - [Redacted]
20 20 26 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/20 8:42 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Colorado . . Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Berman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/29 3:39 PM
ORDER granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re17 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Colorado . addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon fro,14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Colorado . Ok. ( Responses due by 3/20/2024.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/29/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
18 18 order Memo Endorsement Wed 02/28 5:57 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:16 Letter filed by Justin Rojas. ENDORSEMENT: Finish briefing the motion and postpone the conference schedule. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/28/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/28 11:55 AM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Colorado . addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from M. Elias Berman dated February 28, 2024. Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Berman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Mon 02/26 7:51 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Plaintiff and Defendant dated February 26, 2024 re: Scheduling Order. Document filed by Justin Rojas..(Guesno, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Civil Case Management Plan
Thursday, February 22, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/22 12:29 PM
ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION granting13 Motion for Meredith Munro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Upon review of the Motion of Meredith Munro ("Applicant"), for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above referenced matter, the Motion is hereby granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case, in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing the discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/22/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
14 14 motion Dismiss Wed 02/21 9:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Colorado . Document filed by Justin Rojas. Responses due by 3/6/2024.(Guesno, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Motion/Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Rojas Declaration
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 02/20 9:18 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 13 MOTION for Meredith Munro to Appear Pro Hac Vice Re-Filed. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28960985. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/16 5:39 PM
MOTION for Meredith Munro to Appear Pro Hac Vice Re-Filed . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28960985. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Justin Rojas..(Munro, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Munro Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/16 1:41 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Meredith Munro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28958088. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Justin Rojas..(Munro, Meredith) Modified on 2/16/2024 (sgz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Munro Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/16 3:43 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 12 MOTION for Meredith Munro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28958088. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Colorado;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/31 11:42 AM
ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION granting9 Motion for Jacqueline Guesno to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Upon review of the Motion of Jacqueline Guesno ("Applicant"), for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above referenced matter, the Motion is hereby granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice, in the above captioned case, in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court including the Rules governing the discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/31/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/30 2:54 PM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Defendant, Justin Rojas dated 1/29/2024.,1 Complaint. OK - granted. (Justin Rojas answer due 2/21/2024.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/30/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 01/30 9:21 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 9 MOTION for Jacqueline Guesno to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28875265. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/29 7:48 PM
MOTION for Jacqueline Guesno to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28875265. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Justin Rojas..(Guesno, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Jacqueline Guesno,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/29 7:20 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Defendant, Justin Rojas dated 1/29/2024. Document filed by Justin Rojas..(Guerra, Artemio)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/29 5:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Artemio Guerra on behalf of Justin Rojas..(Guerra, Artemio)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
6 6 6 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 01/26 3:48 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/21/2024 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/26/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 01/08 2:45 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Justin Rojas..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 01/08 11:20 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 01/08 11:23 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 01/08 11:23 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 01/08 11:23 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Elias Berman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $3,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $3,000,000;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/05 4:25 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Berman, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/05 4:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Justin Rojas, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Berman, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/05 4:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berman, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/05 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Justin Rojas. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28775756)Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Berman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit I: Rojas Manager Agreement