New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:24-cv-00094
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2024
Terminated:Jan 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 30, 2024 5:12 AM EDT
Defendant
City University N.Y.
Plaintiff
Brenda Lee
929 Courtlandt Apt 10B
Bronx, NY 10451


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 05, 2024
6 6 misc Pro Se Memorandum to Change Address Fri 04/05 3:42 PM
PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 4/1/2024 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Brenda Lee. New Address: 929 Courtlandt Ave, Apt 10B, Bronx, NY, 10451. (kgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Mon 01/29 4:38 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:24-cv-00626, filed on 01/29/2024. (vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
5 5 4 pgs order Order Mon 01/22 1:22 PM
ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This Order closes this case in this court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/22/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 01/22 11:13 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 01/22 11:13 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Mon 01/29 10:00 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application Tue 01/16 4:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/16/2024) (vn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
3 3 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Fri 01/05 3:06 PM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Brenda Lee consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Brenda Lee..(rdz)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/05 3:03 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Brenda Lee..(rdz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/05 2:58 PM
COMPLAINT against City University N.Y.. Document filed by Brenda Lee..(rdz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 01/05 2:59 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]