North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:24-cv-00007
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Terminated:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 02, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education
Represented By
Anna M. Hehenberger, I
Cms Office Of General Counsel
contact info
Heather Seals Bankert
Charlotte-Mecklenburg Board Of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Cedric Dean
5502 McChesney Dr
Charlotte, NC 28269
Plaintiff
Susan Mills Dean
5502 McChesney Dr.
Charlotte, NC 28269
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Charlotte Mecklenburg Schools
Terminated: 03/11/2024
Represented By
Anna M. Hehenberger, I
Cms Office Of General Counsel
contact info
Heather Seals Bankert
Charlotte-Mecklenburg Board Of Education
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
25 25 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 05/14 4:57 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/14/2024. Signed by Clerk, Katherine Hord Simon. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams) (Main Document 25 replaced on 5/14/2024) (ams)
Related: [-]
24 24 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 05/14 4:52 PM
ORDER granting without prejudice 18 Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/14/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
23 23 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Mon 04/08 11:11 AM
ORDER granting Defendant's 22 Second Motion to Seal Document Nos. 13, 17, and 20. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/8/24. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
22 22 motion Seal Document Fri 04/05 1:13 PM
MOTION to Seal Document by Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education. Responses due by 4/19/2024 (Hehenberger, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/02 8:11 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education.(Hehenberger, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
20 20 respm Response to Motion Wed 03/27 10:33 AM
Pro Se RESPONSE to Motion re18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Cedric Dean. Replies due by 4/2/2024 (tlj)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Setting Response Deadline Mon 03/25 1:39 PM
ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Response due by 4/8/2024. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/25/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss Mon 03/25 10:57 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education. Responses due by 4/8/2024 (Bankert, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Monday, March 11, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/11 4:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education, filed by Cedric Dean, Susan Mills Dean.(mga)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/11 4:32 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Approval of Proposed Amended Complaint (Document No. 10-1). The Clerk's Office is directed to docket Plaintiffs' proposed Amended Complaint as a separate entry. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/11/24. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/11 11:42 AM
Pro Se MOTION to Accept Amended Complaint (Document No. 10-1) as Timely Filed by Cedric Dean, Susan Mills Dean. Responses due by 3/22/2024 (tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, March 01, 2024
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/01 1:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss by Charlotte Mecklenburg Schools. (Bankert, Heather)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
13 13 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/23 4:24 PM
Pro Se RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss by Cedric Dean, Susan Mills Dean. Replies due by 3/1/2024(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Setting Response Deadline Wed 02/21 10:13 AM
ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline Response due by 3/6/2024. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/20/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 02/21 8:29 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 10 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Jury Trial; denying as moot Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/20/24. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
10 10 motion Leave to File Document Tue 02/20 3:44 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Cedric Dean. Responses due by 3/5/2024 (tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Tue 02/20 7:44 AM
ORDER granting Defendant's 6 Motion to Seal Document No. 1 and the accompanying exhibits. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/26/24. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
8 8 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 02/16 2:05 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION to Dismiss by Charlotte Mecklenburg Schools. (Bankert, Heather)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss Fri 02/16 2:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Charlotte Mecklenburg Schools. Responses due by 3/1/2024 (Bankert, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
6 6 motion Seal Document Fri 02/16 1:57 PM
MOTION to Seal Document Complaint by Charlotte Mecklenburg Schools. Responses due by 3/1/2024 (Bankert, Heather)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/16 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anna M. Hehenberger, I on behalf of Charlotte Mecklenburg Schools (Hehenberger, Anna)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/16 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Seals Bankert on behalf of Charlotte Mecklenburg Schools (Bankert, Heather)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/05 11:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedric Dean. Charlotte Mecklenburg Schools served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024.(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 01/23 3:41 PM
Summons Issued Conventionally as to Charlotte Mecklenburg Schools. (ams)
Related: [-]
order Oral or Text-Only Order Tue 01/23 3:39 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Text of Order: The Clerk of Court is directed to issue the proposed summons at Doc. No. 1 in this matter. It is further directed that the time to effectuate service is extended to 90 days from this date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that they are responsible for making sure that service is effected properly pursuant to the Rules of Civil Procedure. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Cogburn on 1/23/2024. So Ordered.(Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ams)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/05 11:49 AM
Pro Se COMPLAINT against Charlotte Mecklenburg Schools with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 7518), filed by Cedric Dean, Susan Mills Dean.(cjs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Summons
order Order of Instructions Fri 01/05 11:51 AM
Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Litigants in Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (Pro se litigant served Conventionally at Case Filing.)(cjs)
Related: [-]