Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert E Payne
Case #: 3:24-cv-00013
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 5:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Payne Trucking Co.
Represented By
Kathleen Mary Smith
Setliff Law, P.C.
contact info
Kevin Thomas Streit
Setliff Law, P.C.
contact info
Charles Stephen Setliff
Setliff Law PC
contact info
Clayton D Goris
Wood Smith Henning & Berman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Silkroad Tranz, Inc.
Represented By
Jason Caldwell Greaves
Binnall Law Group
contact info
Shawn M. Flynn
Binnall Law Group
contact info
Jared Joseph Roberts
Binnall Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
38 38 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/07 1:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Silkroad Tranz, Inc.. (Greaves, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Appoint Expert Tue 07/02 1:42 PM
ORDER that the DEFENDANT'S' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STAY THE LAWSUIT PENDING ARBITRATION, AND TO APPOINT AN ARBITRATOR (ECF Nos.24 ,26 and28 ) is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 7/2/2024. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 07/01 11:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell: Settlement Conference held on 6/28/2024. (jsau, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
35 35 misc Designation Expert Witnesses Fri 05/31 10:07 PM
Designation Expert Witnesses by Silkroad Tranz, Inc..(Greaves, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Expert Report,
Att: 2 Appendix A,
Att: 3 Appendix B,
Att: 4 Appendix C,
Att: 5 Appendix D
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/31 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Mary Smith on behalf of Payne Trucking Co. (Smith, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/30 3:58 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, to Stay the case pending Arbitration, and to Appoint an Arbitrator filed by Payne Trucking Co.. (Goris, Clayton)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 27, 2024
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/27 9:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, to Stay the case pending Arbitration, and to Appoint an Arbitrator ,28 MOTION to Appoint Expert (Arbitrator) pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by Silkroad Tranz, Inc..(Greaves, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Thursday, May 23, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/23 4:30 PM
ORDER- This matter is before the Court on DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STAY THE LAWSUIT PENDING ARBITRATION, AND TO APPOINT AN ARBITRATOR (ECF No.24 ). For the reasons set forth on the record during the conference call on May 23, 2024, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file, by May 27, 2024, its response, and the defendant shall file, by May 30, 2024, its reply. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/23/2024. (adun, )
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 05/23 4:27 PM
ORDER that the MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINES, DISCOVERY CUT-OFF, AND DEADLINE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE23 is granted in part and denied in part. With respect to the deadline for expert disclosures, the motion is granted: the plaintiff shall file, by May 31, 2024 its expert disclosures; the defendant shall file, by June 21, 2024, its expert disclosures, and any rebuttal expert disclosures; and the plaintiff shall file, by June 28, 2024, its rebuttal expert disclosures. The motion is denied as to all other deadline extension requests. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall conclude their expert depositions by July 6, 2024. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/23/2024. (adun, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 06/10 1:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne: Telephone Conference held on 5/23/2024. (Court Reporter Krista Liscio, OCR.) (nbrow)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
29 29 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 05/21 4:35 PM
Memorandum in Support re28 MOTION to Appoint Expert (Arbitrator) pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by Payne Trucking Co..(Streit, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Christopher Haney supporting Motion to Appoint Arbitrator,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christopher Haney supporting Motion to Appoint Arbitrator
28 28 motion Appoint Expert Tue 05/21 4:34 PM
MOTION to Appoint Expert (Arbitrator) pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act by Payne Trucking Co.. (Streit, Kevin)
Related: [-]
27 27 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 05/21 4:31 PM
Memorandum in Support re26 MOTION to Stay re25 Memorandum in Support,24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, to Stay the case pending Arbitration, and to Appoint an Arbitrator Motion to Stay the Litigation pending binding arbitration filed by Payne Trucking Co..(Streit, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Christopher Haney supporting Motion to Stay the Litigation Pending Binding Arbitration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Christopher Haney Declaration
26 26 motion Stay Tue 05/21 4:29 PM
MOTION to Stay re25 Memorandum in Support,24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, to Stay the case pending Arbitration, and to Appoint an Arbitrator Motion to Stay the Litigation pending binding arbitration by Payne Trucking Co.. (Streit, Kevin)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Tue 05/21 1:59 PM
Notice of Correction re24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, to Stay the case pending Arbitration, and to Appoint an Arbitrator : The document contains more than one pleading or motion for relief. As a reminder, we request that filing users file a copy of the same document separately for each pleading or motion relief. Please file the document twice again - once as a Motion to Stay the Lawsuit Pending Arbitration, and once as a Motion to Appoint an Arbitrator. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
25 25 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 05/17 4:37 PM
Memorandum in Support re24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, to Stay the case pending Arbitration, and to Appoint an Arbitrator filed by Payne Trucking Co..(Streit, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Christopher Haney supporting Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christopher Haney supporting Motion to Compel Arbitration
24 24 motion Compel Fri 05/17 4:35 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration, to Stay the case pending Arbitration, and to Appoint an Arbitrator by Payne Trucking Co.. (Streit, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Wed 05/15 6:33 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Expert Disclosure Deadlines, Discovery Cut-Off, and Deadline for Settlement Conference by Silkroad Tranz, Inc.. (Greaves, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/10 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Clayton D Goris on behalf of Payne Trucking Co. (Goris, Clayton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Fri 05/10 12:02 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Pro hac vice: Shawn M. Flynn for Silkroad Tranz, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/9/2024. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
20 20 order Protective Order Tue 05/07 3:28 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/7/24.(mful, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A
Monday, May 06, 2024
19 19 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/06 9:22 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Shawn Flynn and Certification of Local Counsel Jason C. Greaves Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9511426. by Silkroad Tranz, Inc.. (Greaves, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
18 18 motion Protective Order Thu 05/02 4:36 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Silkroad Tranz, Inc..(Greaves, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Protective Order
Thursday, April 25, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 04/25 1:07 PM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion (ECF No.15 ) is granted and the parties shall make the expert disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 on the following schedule: May 17, 2024 Plaintiff's disclosures due; June 7, 2024 Defendant's disclosures due; June 21, 2024 Plaintiff's rebuttal disclosures due. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 4/25/2024. (nbrow)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
16 16 5 pgs order Order Set/Reset Hearings Tue 04/23 12:49 PM
ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on June 28, 2024 at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. See Order from details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 4/23/24. (jsau, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
15 15 motion Amend/Correct Mon 04/22 11:01 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct the Court's April 18, 2024 Order Setting Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Payne Trucking Co.. (Streit, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
14 14 order Pretrial Order Thu 04/18 4:14 PM
JURY INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER. At the conference call held on April 18, 2024, this action was set for trial by a jury for two days starting on August 21, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. The Scheduling Order and Pretrial Schedule A previously issued in this action shall remain in effect. A Final Pretrial Conference will be conducted at 1:30 p.m. on August 15, 2024, at which time trial counsel shall appear and present for entry a Final Pretrial Order setting forth: ( See for complete details ). It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 4/18/2024. (nbrow)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/18 12:05 PM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the settlement conference and proceedings required by paragraph 3 of the Scheduling Order are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. Counsel shall be responsible for contacting the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Colombell within five (5) days of the date of this Order to schedule the conference to occur within the fifty-day period required by paragraph 3 of the Scheduling Order or at such other time as Magistrate Judge Colombell shall approve. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 4/18/2024. (nbrow)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/18 12:03 PM
ORDER. Having conferred with counsel at the Initial Pretrial Conference on April 17, 2024, and it appearing that counsel have agreed to a schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall make the expert disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 on the following schedule: May 17, 2024 Plaintiff's disclosures due; June 2, 2024 Defendant's disclosures due; June 21, 2024 Plaintiff's rebuttal disclosures due It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 4/18/2024. (nbrow)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/18 12:06 PM
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell for settlement purposes only. (nbrow)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/18 4:15 PM
Set Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2024 at 01:30 PM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. Jury Trial set for 8/21/2024 at 09:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7400 before District Judge Robert E. Payne. (nbrow)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 05/08 1:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne: Telephone Conference held on 4/18/2024. (no court reporter) (nbrow)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 04/17 1:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/17/2024. (nbrow)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/29 12:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details . It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/29/2024. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs order Order Set/Reset Hearings Fri 03/29 12:17 PM
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2024 at 10:45 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details . Issued at the direction of the Court. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/29/2024. (nbrow)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
9 9 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 02/14 2:25 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Silkroad Tranz, Inc.. (Greaves, Jason)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/14 2:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Silkroad Tranz, Inc. Payne Trucking Co. served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024 (Greaves, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/08 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Stephen Setliff on behalf of Payne Trucking Co. (Setliff, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/02 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Stephen Setliff on behalf of Payne Trucking Co. (Setliff, Charles)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 02/02 1:03 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Payne Trucking Co.. (Streit, Kevin)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/02 1:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Payne Trucking Co..(Streit, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 01/08 9:09 AM
Summons Issued as to Payne Trucking Co. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention. Electronically file the summons return using the filing events Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. Please ensure that the original summons page signed by the clerk is the first document to appear when filing the return of service. (adun, )
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Mon 01/08 9:07 AM
Notice of Correction re1 and2 - Civil Case Cover sheet and Proposed Summons documents replaced as standard PDF's. Filing attorney uploaded fillable forms. Moving forward, attorney reminded to upload standard PDF's only. Also, please include the case number on all filings as well. No further action needed. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 01/05 7:12 PM
Proposed Summons by Silk Road Tranz, Inc.. (Greaves, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/05 7:10 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BVAEDC-9296823.), filed by Silk Road Tranz, Inc..(Greaves, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Mon 01/08 9:05 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (adun, )
Related: [-]