Minnesota District Court
Judge:Nancy E Brasel
Referred: Dulce J Foster
Case #: 0:24-cv-00033
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Terminated:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Legrand Holding, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth Euller
Bradford Andresen Norrie & Camarotto
contact info
Alexander David Klein
Bradford Andresen Norrie & Camarotto
contact info
Elizabeth J Roff
Bradford Andresen Norrie Camarotto
contact info
Plaintiff
R. L. Mlazgar Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Evan Weiner
Droel, PLLC
contact info
Tim L Droel
Droel, PLLC
contact info
Houston Droel
Droel, PLLC
contact info
Ryan James Fargo
Droel, PLLC
contact info
Sydnee Nicole Anderson
Droel, PLLC
contact info
Adam J Oliver
Droel, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 06/25 8:58 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re19 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 6/25/2024. (KMW)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
20 20 1 pgs misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Mon 06/24 12:19 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re19 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Weiner, Evan)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 06/24 12:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by R. L. Mlazgar Associates, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Legrand Holding, Inc.. (Weiner, Evan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
18 18 misc Declaration Fri 03/01 12:14 PM
DECLARATION of Alexander D. Klein re17 Response to Order to Show Cause by Legrand Holding, Inc. .(Klein, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit(s),
Att: 4 Exhibit(s),
Att: 5 Exhibit(s)
17 17 17 pgs misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 03/01 12:10 PM
REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Legrand Holding, Inc. (Klein, Alexander) Modified text on 3/1/2024 (MMP)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
16 16 misc Declaration Fri 02/23 3:12 PM
DECLARATION of Evan H. Weiner re15 Response to Order to Show Cause,13 Order to Show Cause by R. L. Mlazgar Associates, Inc. . (Droel, Houston)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 02/23 3:10 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by R. L. Mlazgar Associates, Inc.. (Droel, Houston)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Fri 02/23 11:37 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Legrand Holding, Inc.. (Roff, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
13 13 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 02/16 3:22 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 2/23/2024. Reply due by 3/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 2/16/2024. (MEH)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court Fri 02/16 10:49 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER: As required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, the Court directs Defendant to file a corporate disclosure statement by February 23, 2024 . The Court further directs Defendant to clarify whether it should be identified as "Legrand Holdings, Inc." or "Legrand Holding, Inc.". Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 2/16/2024. (MEH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
11 11 misc Letter to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/13 10:44 AM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by R. L. Mlazgar Associates, Inc. Joint Letter to Magistrate Judge Regarding Stipulation . (Weiner, Evan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/12 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J Roff on behalf of Legrand Holding, Inc.. (Roff, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
9 9 minutes Status Conference Thu 02/01 10:44 AM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 1/26/2024: Status Conference. Court Reporter: Paula Richter Minneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom 8E Time: 1:59 p.m. 2:12 p.m. 2:32 p.m. 2:34 p.m. Total Time: 15 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Evan Weiner; Adam Oliver For Defendant(s): Elizabeth Roth; Alexander Klein Other Appearance(s): Burt Holm- Plaintiff Representative; Peter Lena- Defendant Representative PROCEEDINGS: Discussion regarding case status. (MEH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/26 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Oliver on behalf of R. L. Mlazgar Associates, Inc.. (Oliver, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
7 7 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Tue 01/16 1:13 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Status Conference set for 1/26/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Counsel and a client representative for each party is ordered to appear in person for the scheduled status conference for both matters 24cv0033 (NEB/DJF) and 22cv0942 (NEB/DJF)). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 1/16/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-cv-00033-NEB-DJF, 0:22-cv-00942-NEB-DJF.(LNP)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/12 2:47 PM
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster for all further proceedings. Judge John R. Tunheim, Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-33 NEB/DJF . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 1/9/2024 and Judge John R. Tunheim.(LTT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
5 5 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Wed 01/10 4:58 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for R. L. Mlazgar Associates, Inc.. (Droel, Houston)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/10 4:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by R. L. Mlazgar Associates, Inc.. Legrand Holding, Inc. served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. (Weiner, Evan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 01/08 8:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Legrand Holding, Inc. (CLK)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 01/08 8:22 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 24-cv-33 JRT/JFD. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/05 6:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Legrand Holding, Inc. (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10754895) filed by R. L. Mlazgar Associates, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Droel, Houston)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet