Connecticut District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00006
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 06, 2024 2:20 AM EST
Defendant
Anthony Niro (1)
Represented By
Jonathan S. Katz
Jacobs & Dow, LLC
contact info
William F. Dow, III
Jacobs & Dow, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher W. Schmeisser
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
Vanessa Roberts Avery
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/06/2024 2:55 AM EST
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
1 1 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to John Doe: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Waiver and Plea Hearing set for 1/4/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Omar A. Williams. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
2 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL as to John Doe - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/3/24. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
Set Deadline as to Anthony Niro: Recommended Sentencing date due by 1/12/2024. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
3 3 INFORMATION as to Anthony Niro Count 1. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT, by Anthony Niro. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Omar A. Williams as to Anthony Niro: Initial Appearance, Waiver and Plea Hearing, Detention Hearing held on 1/4/2024. Guilty Plea entered as to Count 1. Court defers entering a scheduling order and instructs the parties to meet and confer, in consultation with Probation, and arrive at a mutually agreeable date. The parties to docket a recommended sentencing date by Friday, January 12, 2024. Time: 52 minutes (Court Reporter Catherine Cullen) (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Anthony Niro pursuant to Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020). Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/4/24. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
7 7 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Anthony Niro. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulated Fofeiture Agreement
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Anthony Niro. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/4/24. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
9 9 Unsecured, non-surety Appearance Bond Entered as to Anthony Niro in amount of $50,000. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
10 10 SEALED BAIL INFORMATION SHEET by Anthony Niro. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
11 11 Notice of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William F. Dow, III appearing for Anthony Niro. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]
12 12 Notice of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan S. Katz appearing for Anthony Niro. (Velez, Frances)
Related: [-]