New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:24-cv-00118
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2024
Terminated:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Merkle Inc.
Represented By
Diane Windholz
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Laura Victorelli
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Elin Frodin
Represented By
William Michael Brown
Brown Kwon & Lam, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, July 11, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 07/11 5:17 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time The request to extend the deadline to reopen this matter until August 16, 2024, is granted. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/11/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time Thu 07/11 10:46 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Reopen addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from William Brown dated July 11, 2024. Document filed by Elin Frodin..(Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Mon 06/17 1:09 PM
ORDER The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ORDERED, that the above-entitled action be and hereby is discontinued, without costs to either party, subject to reopening should the settlement not be consummated within thirty (30) days of the date hereof. Any application to reopen must be filed within thirty (30) days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, the parties are advised that if they wish the Court to retain jurisdiction in this matter for purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the next thirty (30) days with a request that the agreement be "so ordered" by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/17/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Fri 06/14 4:15 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from William Brown dated June 14, 2024 re: Settlement. Document filed by Elin Frodin..(Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 04/17 11:15 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 5/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sge)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Thu 03/21 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 4/22/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
10 10 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 03/19 9:47 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 4/2/2024. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/11 5:05 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Dentsu Group Inc. for Merkle Inc.. Document filed by Merkle Inc...(Windholz, Diane)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/11 9:38 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Merkle Inc...(Windholz, Diane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
7 7 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/11 1:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Victorelli on behalf of Merkle Inc...(Victorelli, Laura)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/11 1:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diane Windholz on behalf of Merkle Inc...(Windholz, Diane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/10 12:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Merkle Inc. waiver sent on 1/9/2024, answer due 3/11/2024. Document filed by Elin Frodin..(Brown, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 01/08 12:10 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merkle Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 01/08 12:07 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Michael Brown. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 445 (Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 442 (Civil Rights: Jobs);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 01/08 12:08 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 01/08 12:09 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 01/08 12:10 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 06, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sat 01/06 12:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merkle Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Elin Frodin..(Brown, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sat 01/06 12:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 01/06 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Merkle Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28777858)Document filed by Elin Frodin..(Brown, William)
Related: [-]