Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:24-cv-80014
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2024
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024
Case in other court:15th Judicial Circuit in and for Palm Beach County, 50-02023-CA-016271 (Div. AF)
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Welpak FAS Florida Inc.
a Florida Profit Corporation Isicoff Ragatz 601 Brickell Key Drive Suite 750
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Teresa Ragatz
Isicoff Ragatz
contact info
Christopher Michael Yannuzzi
Isicoff Ragatz
contact info
Eric David Isicoff
Isicoff Ragatz
contact info
Mediator
Ret. Judge Rosa Rodriguez
Salmon & Dulberg Dispute Resolution 1395 Brickell Avenue Suite 800
Miami, FL 33131
Plaintiff
Gabriela Sroka
Daniel H. Hunt, Esq. P.O. Box 565096
Miami, FL 33256
Represented By
Warren James Pearson
contact info
Daniel H. Hunt
Daniel H. Hunt, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 04/16 9:07 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting20 Motion to Dismiss by default pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c) and the Court's prior order to show cause. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
22 22 order Order to Show Cause Wed 04/10 11:36 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The deadline for the Plaintiff to respond to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss was March 5, 2024. No response appears in the court file. Accordingly, the Plaintiff shall show cause by April 15, 2024, why the motion should not be granted and why the Plaintiff failed to file a response to the Motion. The Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order may result in the Motion being granted by default pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
21 21 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Thu 02/29 3:35 PM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Rosa Rodriguez as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 11/4/2024 at 2:00 p.m.. (Yannuzzi, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
20 20 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/20 4:31 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS14 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Welpak FAS Florida Inc.. Responses due by 3/5/2024.(Yannuzzi, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Sworn EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's E-mails
Monday, February 12, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/12 3:20 PM
ORDER SETTING ZOOM DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE: STATUS CONFERENCE Re: Discovery Matters set for 8/12/2024 at 03:00 PM, via Zoom, before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Joint Discovery Status Report due by 8/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
18 18 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks Fri 02/09 1:49 PM
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction re 17 Order. Document Filed in Wrong Case ; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 24cv80104 (kpe)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 02/09 12:19 PM
ORDER Setting Status Conference, Calendar Call, Pretrial Deadlines, And Trial Date, Order Of Requirements, And Order Of Reference To Mediation: (Fact Discovery due by 9/13/2024., Expert Discovery due by 9/13/2024., Dispositive Motions due by 10/14/2024., Jury Trial set for 1/13/2025 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 1/8/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 11/13/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/9/2024. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/06 9:08 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of the amended complaint at docket entry 14. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Mon 02/05 11:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Welpak FAS Florida Inc., filed by Gabriela Sroka.(Pearson, Warren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/31 9:15 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the Plaintiff to respond to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is February 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Wed 01/31 11:15 AM
Set Deadline per DE 13 Order as to5 Motion. Response due by 2/5/2024. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/30 11:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to have response date to the motion to dismiss moved to Feb 5 re5 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gabriela Sroka. Responses due by 2/13/2024. (Pearson, Warren)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 01/30 10:46 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren James Pearson on behalf of Gabriela Sroka. Attorney Warren James Pearson added to party Gabriela Sroka(pty:pla). (Pearson, Warren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
10 10 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 01/24 1:16 PM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
9 9 misc Status Report Mon 01/22 5:29 PM
STATUS REPORT - Removal by Welpak FAS Florida Inc.(Yannuzzi, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - State Court Docket,
Att: 2 Exhibit - State Removal Notice
8 8 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 01/22 4:59 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Welpak FAS Florida Inc.(Yannuzzi, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Mon 01/22 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/22 2:57 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/12 5:12 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Welpak FAS Florida Inc.. Responses due by 1/26/2024. (Yannuzzi, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/11 3:24 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gabriela Sroka (Hunt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/11 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel H. Hunt on behalf of Gabriela Sroka (Hunt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 01/08 3:51 PM
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Mon 01/08 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17194390, filed by Welpak FAS Florida Inc..(Yannuzzi, Christopher) Modified on 1/8/2024: No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed (caw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit - State Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit - State Court Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit State Court Case Management Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit - State Summons