Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Jonathan JC Grey
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:24-cv-10053
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:1396 - Tort Negligence
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2024
Terminated:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Corewell Health East
Represented By
Timothy J. Lowe
Mcdonald Hopkins PLC
contact info
Mitchell Capp
Mcdonald Hopkins
contact info
Michael G. Latiff
Mcdonald Hopkins, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Welltok Inc.
Represented By
Fred K. Herrmann
Kerr, Russell,
contact info
Plaintiff
Joni Lipson
Represented By
David H. Fink
Fink Bressack PLLC
contact info
Nathan J. Fink
Fink Bressack PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Welltok LLC
Terminated: 01/25/2024


Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Tue 03/19 12:05 PM
Case transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in District of Massachusetts as case 1:24-cv-10684, filed 03/19/2024. (VLun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
18 18 notice Notice - Other Wed 03/06 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Transfer to the District of Massachusetts for MDL 3083 (SSch)
Related: [-]
17 17 order MDL Transfer Order - Transfer Out Wed 03/06 3:03 PM
MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-33) to District of Massachusetts for MDL # 3083. (SSch)
Related: [-]
16 16 order MDL Transfer Order - Transfer Out Wed 03/06 8:38 AM
MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-33) for MDL # 3083. [Informational Copy] (SSch)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Wed 03/06 3:10 PM
Case transferred to District of Massachusetts. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
15 15 order Stipulation and Order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Wed 02/28 3:56 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to1 Complaint as to Welltok Inc.'s, ( Response due by 4/1/2024 ) Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
14 14 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 02/23 4:35 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Fred K. Herrmann appearing on behalf of Welltok Inc. (Herrmann, Fred)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
13 13 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/08 5:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Welltok Inc. served on 2/5/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. (Fink, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
12 12 order Stipulation and Order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Thu 02/01 9:25 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Corewell Health East to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, ( Response due by 4/1/2024 ) Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
11 11 notice Appearance Tue 01/30 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Latiff on behalf of Corewell Health East. (Latiff, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Appearance Tue 01/30 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Capp on behalf of Corewell Health East. (Capp, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance Tue 01/30 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Lowe on behalf of Corewell Health East. (Lowe, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
8 8 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 01/26 10:13 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Joni Lipson. (Fink, Nathan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued* Fri 01/26 9:13 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Welltok Inc.* (DJen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
6 6 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Thu 01/25 10:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Joni Lipson against Corewell Health East, Welltok Inc.. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Fink, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Breach Notice
service Request for Additional Summons Thu 01/25 10:18 PM
REQUEST for SUMMONS for Welltok Inc.. (Fink, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
5 5 order Show Cause Thu 01/11 5:16 PM
ORDER for Joni Lipson to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Jurisdiction for Failure to Properly Plead Diversity of the Parties. Show Cause Response due by 1/26/2024 Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
4 4 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/10 3:36 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Corewell Health East served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. (Fink, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued* Tue 01/09 11:49 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Corewell Health East, Welltok LLC* (DJen)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Tue 01/09 11:50 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DJen)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 01/08 5:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Fink on behalf of Joni Lipson. (Fink, Nathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 01/08 5:40 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Joni Lipson against Corewell Health East, Welltok LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9616000 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Fink, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Breach Notice