Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jerry W Blackwell
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:24-cv-00044
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2024
Terminated:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 3:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Board of Trustees for Capella University
Plaintiff
Jerome L. Grimes
Jerome Grimes (Pro Se) General Delivery
Carlsbad, CA 92008


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
10 10 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Wed 04/03 12:10 PM
JUDGMENT(MKB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
9 9 order Order/Notice to Attorney Tue 04/02 2:33 PM
CORRECTED ORDER granting7 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; denying2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 4/2/2024. (MSK)
Related: [-]
8 8 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Order on Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs Tue 04/02 2:00 PM
FILED IN ERROR - ORDER granting7 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; denying2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 4/2/2024. (MSK) Modified text on 4/2/2024 (MSK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/22 8:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Motion For Leave To File AMENDED Complaint against Board of Trustees for Capella University. filed by Jerome L. Grimes. Filer requests summons issued. (Grimes, Jerome)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/22 12:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT In Pro Se, PLAINTIFF against Board of Trustees for Capella University. filed by Jerome L. Grimes. Filer requests summons issued. (Grimes, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
5 5 notice Clerk's Notice - Application for Pro Se E-Filer Wed 02/21 2:12 PM
Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Jerome Lenard Grimes is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Jerome Lenard Grimes has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (KMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/08 3:51 PM
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO (ECF) ELECTRONIC FILING PERMISSION filed by Jerome L. Grimes. (JGK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Mon 01/08 3:47 PM
DECLARATION of Jerome L. Grimes by Jerome L. Grimes. (JGK)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP) Mon 01/08 3:44 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jerome L. Grimes. (JGK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/08 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Board of Trustees for Capella University filed by Jerome L. Grimes.. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (JGK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Envelope