Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Referred: John K Larkins, III
Case #: 1:24-cv-00088
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2024
Terminated:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Austin Capital Bank SSB
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
Represented By
Casondra Turner
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kendell Craigg
1908 Paperbirch Cove
Grayson, GA 30017
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kovo Credit Inc.
Terminated: 03/22/2024
Represented By
Jonathan K. Aust
Bedard Law Group, P.C.
contact info
John H. Bedard, Jr.
Bedard Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Thursday, October 31, 2024
20 20 misc Judgment - Clerk Thu 10/31 2:25 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule 41.3(A), NDGa. (ane)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Thu 10/31 2:20 PM
ORDER ADOPTING17 Final Report and Recommendation. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Local Rule 41.3(A), NDGa, for Plaintiff's failure to make the case ready and failure to obey lawful orders of this Court. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 10/31/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 10/31 2:23 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/31 2:26 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kendell Craigg re19 Order,20 Clerk's Judgment. (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Wed 10/09 2:04 PM
ORDER for Service of17 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 10/9/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Wed 10/09 2:03 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint, filed by Kendell Craigg. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 10/9/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/09 2:05 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kendell Craigg re17 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION,18 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/19 8:49 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kendell Craigg re16 Order. (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Thu 09/19 8:48 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file an amended complaint that complies with the Court's August 20, 2024 order by October 4, 2024. Plaintiff is warned that the Court will take her failure to do so as an indication that she is not interested in prosecuting this case, and will recommend the dismissal of this action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit the matter to the undersigned after expiration of the above time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 9/18/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 09/18 2:39 PM
Submission of15 Order on Non-Final Report and Recommendation to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (sap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
15 15 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendation Tue 08/20 3:53 PM
ORDER: The Court OVERRULES Plaintiff's13 Objection and ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's10 R&R. Defendant Bank of America Corporation's3 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims against it are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's request to amend her complaint is GRANTED. Any amended complaint MUST be filed by September 12, 2024. This case is returned to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 8/20/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 08/20 3:55 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kendell Craigg re15 Order. (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 04/23 1:12 PM
Submission of10 NON-REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
14 14 respm Response (Non-Motion) Thu 04/18 2:11 PM
RESPONSE re13 Objections to Report and Recommendation Related [+] filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Turner, Casondra)
Related: [-] sponse to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Non-Final Report and Recommendation
Friday, April 05, 2024
13 13 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendation Mon 04/08 12:36 PM
OBJECTIONS to10 Report and Recommendation filed by Kendell Craigg. (ane)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
12 12 misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Fri 03/22 8:27 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING9 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Kovo Credit Inc. pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/22 8:21 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kendell Craigg re10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION,11 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/22 8:29 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kendell Craigg re12 Clerks Entry of Dismissal. (ane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Fri 03/22 8:19 AM
ORDER for Service of10 Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 3/21/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 03/22 8:17 AM
NON-FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Bank of America's3 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 3/21/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/20 10:26 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Kovo Credit Inc.. (Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 03/19 10:51 AM
Submission of3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (sap)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/05 12:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kendell Craigg. (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
7 7 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 02/27 12:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING4 Motion to Stay. All pretrial and discovery deadlines are STAYED pending further Court order. Plaintiff is ORDERED respond the motion to dismiss or to show cause why his case should not be dismissed by no later than March 12, 2024. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit the matter to the undersigned after expiration of the above time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/27/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 02/27 12:44 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kendell Craigg re7 Order. (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/13 1:17 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kovo Credit Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kovo Inc. for Kovo Credit Inc.. (Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/13 1:16 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Kovo Credit Inc.. Discovery ends on 7/12/2024.(Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
4 4 motion Stay Fri 02/09 10:36 AM
MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery (Incorporated Brief) with Brief In Support by Bank of America Corporation.(Turner, Casondra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 08, 2024
3 3 motion Dismiss Thu 02/08 2:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Bank of America Corporation.(Turner, Casondra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Monday, January 08, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 01/08 2:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Austin Capital Bank SSB, Bank of America Corporation, Kovo Credit Inc. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/08 2:18 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kendell Craigg. (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100008761)(jbu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet