California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:24-cv-00033
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2024
Terminated:Jan 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 01, 2024 1:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Grand National Mother Lodge
Defendant
Great National Lodge of Freemasons Germany
Defendant
Southgate, CA
Defendant
Abu Dhabi Investment Authority
Defendant
Yolanda Adams
Defendant
Albertville Town Hall
Defendant
HRH Prince Samanbin Hamad Alkhalifa
Defendant
Apple Corps Limited
Defendant
Apple Corps Ltd
Defendant
Archiocese of Milan
Defendant
Ashanti United Church of Christ
Defendant
Mount Austin
Defendant
Fantasia Barrino
Defendant
Victoria Beckham
Defendant
Beyoglu District Governoship
Defendant
Borgerservice
Defendant
Breath of the Spirit
Defendant
Todd Bridges
Defendant
Dr Juanita Bynum
Defendant
Igreja dos Carmelitas
Defendant
Tanis Carter
Defendant
Catholicosate of All Armenians Mother Sea of Holy Etchriaction
Defendant
Church of Ireland
Defendant
Columbia University
Defendant
Corus Entertainment Inc
Defendant
Jesus Lenin Cota Ramirez
Defendant
Council of Isles of Scilly
Defendant
DJ Khaled
Defendant
DRS
Defendant
Dares Salaam Institute of Technology
Defendant
Demi Lovato Phiymack, Inc.
Defendant
Diocese of Rochester
Defendant
Diocese of Victoria
Defendant
Celione Dion
Defendant
Disney Consumer Products
Defendant
Ashanti Douglas
Defendant
El Cartel Records Inc.
Defendant
El JEM Amphitheater
Defendant
El Sharqeya Governorate
Defendant
Fimalaya Studio
Defendant
Megan Fox
Defendant
Frankline Franklin
Defendant
Freemasons of the Grand Orient of Italy
Defendant
Victoria Gap
Defendant
Georges Creek Valley No. 161
Defendant
Hammerson
Defendant
Victoria Harbour
Defendant
Daniel Hernandez
Defendant
Hiram Lodge No. 103
Defendant
Tanis Huffman
Defendant
ISIS Naija Gaston
Defendant
Igreja de Carmo
Defendant
Igreja de Nossa Senhora da Graca
Defendant
Immaculate Conception Cathedral School
Defendant
International Centre for Missing and Exploited Children
Defendant
International Criminal Court
Defendant
Ionic Lodge No. 145
Defendant
Ja Role
Defendant
Bishop T. D. Jakes
Defendant
Jamaica Bay Wildlife Refuge
Defendant
Jephthah Lodge No. 222
Defendant
Jerez de la Frontera
Defendant
Jesus College in the University of Oxford of Queen
Defendant
Jesus Is The Answer Apostolic Church
Defendant
Jita Impact Center Incorporated
Defendant
Johnson City, Tennessee
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
Defendant
Kany West, Kanye Omari West
Defendant
King Davis Lodge
Defendant
Knights Tempar Commandery Zone 12
Defendant
MCA Records Canada
Defendant
Malboro, Maryland
Defendant
Mary, Queen of the World Cathedral
Defendant
Maryland Masonic Lodge of Research
Defendant
Mobile, Alabama
Defendant
Mohawk Correctional Facility
Defendant
Montserrat
Defendant
Mount Olympus
Defendant
Mt. Moriah Lodge No. 116
Defendant
Mt. Olympus Theme Park
Defendant
Municipality of Crotone
Defendant
Municipality of Dion-Olympou
Defendant
Municipality of Ojen
Defendant
Spain Murcia
Defendant
Nayvadivs Demon Cash
Defendant
Olimpo de Bahi Blanca
Defendant
Olympia, Washington
Defendant
Onyx
Defendant
Open Data Institute
Defendant
Orange Valley Lodge
Defendant
Our Lady of Victory Church
Defendant
Paulist Fathers
Defendant
Peach Tree Rascals
Defendant
Kenneth Zoo Petty
Defendant
Port of Antonio
Defendant
Powerback Rehabilitation
Defendant
Python Monty Pictures Limited
Defendant
Queen City No. 131
Defendant
Queens, New York Borough
Defendant
ROME
Defendant
Rastafarianism URI
Defendant
Ringo Starr
Defendant
Rose Island Amusement Park
Defendant
Royal Tunbridge Wells
Defendant
Royal Victoria Place
Defendant
Saint Ann Parish Council
Defendant
Saint Anthony of Padua
Defendant
Salem
Defendant
Sharon Lodge No. 132
Defendant
Sing Sing Correctional Facility
Defendant
Spelrnan
Defendant
St. Antoine de Padoue Churche
Defendant
St. Brides Correctional Facility
Defendant
St. Johns Lodge No. 1 A.Y.M.
Defendant
Fredro Starr
Defendant
Techonology Company Limited, TCL
Defendant
Temple of Bel
Defendant
Temple of Bel-Shamin
Defendant
Texas Scottfish Rite Hospital for Children
Defendant
Texas Scottish Rite Hospital for Children
Defendant
The BritishLand Company PLC
Defendant
The Grand Lodge of New Brunswick
Defendant
The Mosti Worshipful Grand Lodge of Ancient Free and Accepted Masons
Defendant
The Pennsylvania Masonic Temple
Defendant
The Rock
Defendant
The Topac Amaru Shakur Foundation Inc. LLC
Defendant
The World Famous Clown Motel
Defendant
TokyoDisney Sea
Defendant
Topac Amaru Shakur Foundation
Defendant
Trinity Theatre
Defendant
Tupa Amaru Shakur Center for the Arts
Defendant
United Grand Lodge of Englant
Defendant
United Nations Office on Drugs and Crime
Defendant
Universidad de Cadiz
Defendant
University of Porto
Defendant
Casandra Elizabeth Ventura
Defendant
Victoria Dockside
Defendant
Victoria Harbor, Admiralty, Hong Kong
Defendant
Victoria Harbour, Whart St
Defendant
Walt Disney Imagineering
Defendant
Watss Montsary Chapel
Defendant
Watts Gallery-Artists Village
Defendant
Michael Lamar White, IV
Defendant
World Wide Web Consortivon, Inc.
Defendant
World Wide Web Foundation
Defendant
Worshipful Company of Masons
Defendant
Steve Wozniak
Defendant
York Rite East Aurora Ch. 282
Plaintiff
Victoria Tenisha Shanae Dillihunt
12035 South Broadway, Apt. K
Los Angeles, CA 90061


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 18, 2024
9 9 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Thu 01/18 4:40 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner DENYING REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)2 , this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 01/11 2:13 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
7 7 order Transfer DECLINED-(related case)(CV-34) Wed 01/10 4:15 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related [+] filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Cormac J. Carney, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:22-cv-08516 CJC(MAR) (rn)
Related: [-] lated Case
Monday, January 08, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 01/08 8:49 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 01/08 8:48 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 01/08 8:47 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 01/08 8:46 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Dillihunt. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Mon 01/08 8:45 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Dillihunt. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 105 pgs cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 01/08 8:38 AM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Grand National Mother Lodge, Great National Lodge of Freemasons Germany, Knights Templar Commandery, Southgate, CA.Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Victoria Tenisha Dillihunt.. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 1 to Complaint,
Att: 2 Part 2 to Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet