Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-02916

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David M Warren
Case #: 5:24-ap-00001
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2024
Terminated:Jul 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Attorney General of the United States 950 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Washington, DC 20530
Represented By
Merrick Garland
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Washington, DC 20530
Represented By
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Department Of Justice
United States Attorney/Civil Process Eastern District Of North Carolina 310 New Bern Avenue - Suite 800
Raleigh, NC 27601
Represented By
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Education
400 Maryland Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20202
Represented By
United States Department of Education
contact info
Defendant
United States Department Of Education
400 Maryland Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20202
Represented By
United States Department Of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Dionne Evette Williams
701 Noble Oak Way Apt 103
Raleigh, NC 27601
Represented By
Derek R Caldwell
Law Office Of Derek R. Caldwell
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, July 01, 2024
utility Terminate Motion (Public) Mon 07/01 8:37 AM
Motion Terminated. Withdrawn Related [+] (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Dionne Evette Williams
utility Calendar - Remove Mon 07/01 8:37 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Remove from Calendar - Motion Withdrawn Related [+] (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] ument no.17 Notice of Hearing (related document(s):14 First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Derek R Caldwell on behalf of Dionne Evette Williams) Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 11:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (3rd Floor)
court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/01 8:38 AM
Adversary Case 5:24-ap-1 Closed (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
19 19 notice Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 06/28 9:47 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Derek R Caldwell, Benjamin Higgins on behalf of United States Department of Education, Dionne Evette Williams. (Higgins, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
18 18 misc Withdrawal of Document Thu 06/27 2:49 PM
Withdrawal of Document filed by Derek R Caldwell on behalf of Dionne Evette Williams Related [+]. (Caldwell, Derek)
Related: [-] 14 First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
17 17 court Hearing Set (Motion) Wed 06/26 12:00 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 11:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (3rd Floor) (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-] 14 First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Derek R Caldwell on behalf of Dionne Evette Williams
16 16 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Wed 06/26 11:58 AM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Related [+] (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-] ument no.14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Dionne Evette Williams
Thursday, June 13, 2024
15 15 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK) Thu 06/13 3:45 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Derek Caldwell. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. Related [+] Due by 6/27/2024. (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] ument no.14 First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Dionne Evette Williams
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
14 14 motion Dismiss Adversary Wed 05/22 1:23 PM
First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Derek R Caldwell on behalf of Dionne Evette Williams. (Caldwell, Derek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
13 13 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Tue 05/14 1:53 PM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 6/13/2024. . (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
12 12 utility Calendar - Schedule Tue 05/14 1:22 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/13 11:12 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Benjamin Higgins on behalf of United States Department of Education. (Higgins, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
10 10 order Extend Time Tue 04/30 1:06 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 5/13/2024. (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, April 19, 2024
9 9 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Fri 04/19 4:43 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Benjamin Higgins on behalf of United States Department of Education Related [+] (Higgins, Benjamin)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint,8 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
8 8 order Extend Time Tue 02/27 12:20 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 4/22/2024. (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, February 16, 2024
7 7 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK) Fri 02/16 7:52 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Benjamin Higgins. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. Related [+] Due by 3/1/2024. (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] ument no.6 First Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by United States Department of Education
Thursday, February 15, 2024
6 6 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Thu 02/15 9:06 AM
First Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Benjamin Higgins on behalf of United States Department of Education Related [+]. (Higgins, Benjamin)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 01/23 12:01 PM
Amended/Amendment to Summons Service Executed on United States Department of Education 1/23/2024. filed by Derek R Caldwell on behalf of Dionne Evette Williams. (Caldwell, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
4 4 court Summons Reissued Mon 01/22 1:05 PM
Summons Reissued on United States Department of Education Date Issued 1/22/2024, Answer Due 2/21/2024 (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Mon 01/22 1:06 PM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Summons Reissued Related [+] (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] ument no. 3 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP)
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
3 3 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Tue 01/09 1:28 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Derek R Caldwell. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. Failure to do so may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 1/22/2024. (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Adversary case 24-00001 5. Complaint by Dionne Evette Williams against Merrick Garland, United States Department of Justice, United States Department Of Justice, United States Department of Education, United States Department Of Education (Fee Not Required) (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) filed by Dionne Evette Williams
Monday, January 08, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 01/08 1:27 PM
Summons Issued on Merrick Garland Answer Due 02/7/2024; United States Department of Justice Answer Due 02/7/2024; United States Department Of Justice Answer Due 02/7/2024; United States Department of Education Answer Due 02/7/2024; United States Department Of Education Answer Due 02/7/2024 (Caldwell, Derek)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/08 1:27 PM
Adversary case 24-00001 5. Complaint by Dionne Evette Williams against Merrick Garland, United States Department of Justice, United States Department Of Justice, United States Department of Education, United States Department Of Education (Fee Not Required) (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Caldwell, Derek)
Related: [-]