California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Case #: 2:24-cv-00107
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2024
Case in other court:Sacramento County Superior Court, 23CV012350
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 1:24 AM PDT
Defendant
BG Retail, LLC
Represented By
Paul M. Smith
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Alexandra M. Asterlin
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Sona Patel
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Michael John Nader
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Corrales
Represented By
Amanda Luisa Fazio
D.Law, Inc.
contact info
Roman Shkodnik
D.Law, Inc.
contact info
Emil Davtyan
D.Law, Inc.
contact info
David Harmik Yeremian
D.Law, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Diana Ponce
Represented By
Amanda Luisa Fazio
D.Law, Inc.
contact info
Roman Shkodnik
D.Law, Inc.
contact info
Emil Davtyan
D.Law, Inc.
contact info
David Harmik Yeremian
D.Law, Inc.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Caleres, Inc.
Terminated: 03/05/2024
Represented By
Alexandra M. Asterlin
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Sona Patel
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Michael John Nader
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Defendant
Famous Footwear
Terminated: 03/05/2024
Represented By
Alexandra M. Asterlin
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Sona Patel
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Michael John Nader
Ogletree Deakins
contact info

GPO Jan 24 2024
MINUTE ORDER issued by Deputy Clerk J. Donati for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/24/2024: The court has determined that it inadvertently served the incorrect text version of the Order Setting Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference when this case was first opened. The text of the order that should have been served is attached here. To the extent the substantive provisions of this order conflict with the previously issued order, this order controls. Counsel should carefully review this version of the order and note changes applicable to future events in this case. By providing a copy of the correct text of the order, the court is not setting any new dates or changing and dates previously set. SO ORDERED. (Donati, J)
GPO Jan 31 2024
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/30/24 SETTING the following deadlines: Opposition: 02/06/24 and Reply: 02/16/24. (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO Mar 05 2024
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/4/2024 CONSOLIDATING CASES 2:24-cv-0107 KJM CKD and 2:24-cv-0623 KJM AC, DISMISSING Caleres, Inc. without prejudice, DIRECTING Plaintiffs to file a Consolidated Complaint against BG Retail, LLC dba Famous Footwear by 4/17/2024 and DENYING 8 Motion to Dismiss as moot. (Donati, J)
GPO Mar 29 2024
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/28/24 EXTENDING Defendant's responsive pleading deadline on Plaintiff's Consolidated Complaint to 6/13/24. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Jun 14 2024
econd Consolidated Complaint. (Woodson, A)ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/13/2024 GRANTING leave to Plaintiffs, to file a Second Consolidated Complaint within 7 days of this order. Defendant's responsive pleading is due within 30 days of the filing of the S
GPO Jul 26 2024
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/26/2024 GRANTING the 33 Stipulation and EXTENDING Defendant's Responsive Pleading deadline on Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint from 07/12/2024 to 07/26/2024. (Nair, C)
GPO Jul 26 2024
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/26/2024 GRANTING the 34 Stipulation and STAYING this action entirety until 30 days after the 01/21/2025 mediation date. The Status Conference set for 8/22/2024 is VACATED and CONTINUED to 3/13/2025 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and with the filing of a Joint Status report 14 days prior. Defendants shall respond to the 31 Second Amended Complaint by 02/20/2025. Within 5 business days following the Mediation Date, the Parties shall file a Joint Report to the Court on the status of the negotiations, including whether the parties have reached a settlement. (Nair, C)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
44 44 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 03/27 1:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Senior District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/27/2025: Pursuant to the representations of the parties, the court has determined this case has settled. See ECF No.42 . Dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 6/27/2025. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines/hearings are VACATED, including the Status Conference scheduled for 3/27/2025 (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk MCF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
43 43 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 03/12 10:03 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/11/2025 DENYING AS MOOT the parties' request to continue the "Case Management Conference." A Status Conference is now set for 3/27/2025 at 02:30 PM via Zoom before Senior District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The deadline to file dispositional documents remains 3/14/2025. The parties may renew their request to extend that deadline at the status conference on 3/27/2025. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
42 42 misc Status Report Wed 03/05 2:57 PM
STATUS REPORT by Anthony Corrales. (Shkodnik, Roman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
41 41 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/04 1:40 PM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/4/2025 CONSTRUING the joint status report as a request for an extension of time; and GRANTING that request nunc pro tunc. Dispositional documents must be filed by 3/14/2025. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
40 40 misc Status Report Tue 02/25 10:35 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by BG Retail, LLC, Caleres, Inc., Famous Footwear. (Asterlin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
39 39 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/31 1:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Senior District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/31/2025: Pursuant to the representations of the parties, the court has determined this case has settled. See ECF No.38 . Dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 2/21/2025. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines/hearings are VACATED.(Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk MCF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
38 38 misc Status Report Fri 01/24 2:38 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by BG Retail, LLC, Famous Footwear. (Asterlin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 09/26 1:32 PM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Roman Shkodnik. (Shkodnik, Roman)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
36 36 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Case Stayed Fri 07/26 3:17 PM
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/26/2024 GRANTING the34 Stipulation and STAYING this action entirety until 30 days after the 01/21/2025 mediation date. The Status Conference set for 8/22/2024 is VACATED and CONTINUED to 3/13/2025 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and with the filing of a Joint Status report 14 days prior. Defendants shall respond to the31 Second Amended Complaint by 02/20/2025. Within 5 business days following the Mediation Date, the Parties shall file a Joint Report to the Court on the status of the negotiations, including whether the parties have reached a settlement. (Nair, C)
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 07/26 11:39 AM
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/26/2024 GRANTING the33 Stipulation and EXTENDING Defendant's Responsive Pleading deadline on Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint from 07/12/2024 to 07/26/2024. (Nair, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
34 34 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 07/25 3:20 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Stay of All Proceedings Pending Mediation by Caleres, Inc., Famous Footwear. (Patel, Sona)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Parties' Joint Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation
Thursday, July 11, 2024
33 33 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 07/11 4:16 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by BG Retail, LLC, Caleres, Inc., Famous Footwear. Attorney Smith, Paul M. added. (Smith, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 14, 2024
32 32 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 06/14 3:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/14/2024: In light of the 6/14/2024 Order, filed at ECF No.30 , the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 7/11/2024 is RESET for 8/22/2024 at 2:30 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a Joint Status Report due fourteen (14) days prior. The August Hearing will proceed by video conferencing through the Zoom application. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the hearing access information no less than 24 hours before the hearing. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
31 31 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/14 2:04 PM
SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Angela Diana Ponce, Anthony Corrales.(Shkodnik, Roman)
Related: [-]
30 30 3 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 06/14 10:55 AM
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/13/2024 GRANTING leave to Plaintiffs, to file a Second Consolidated Complaint within 7 days of this order. Defendant's responsive pleading is due within 30 days of the filing of the Second Consolidated Complaint. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
29 29 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 06/12 3:26 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to File Second Consolidated Complaint by Anthony Corrales, Angela Diana Ponce.(Shkodnik, Roman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Second Consolidated Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
28 28 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/17 1:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/17/2024: In light of the 3/29/2024 Order, ECF No.27 , EXTENDING the deadline for Defendant's responsive pleading, and on the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 6/27/2024 is RESET for 7/11/2024 at 2:30 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a Joint Status Report due fourteen (14) days prior. The July Hearing will proceed by video conferencing through the Zoom application. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the hearing access information no less than 24 hours before the hearing. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
27 27 3 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 03/29 11:25 AM
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/28/24 EXTENDING Defendant's responsive pleading deadline on Plaintiff's Consolidated Complaint to 6/13/24. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
26 26 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 03/26 12:05 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Defendant's Responsive Pleading Deadline Date by Anthony Corrales, Angela Diana Ponce.(Fazio, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 18, 2024
25 25 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Mon 03/18 2:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/18/2024: In light of the 3/5/2024 Order consolidating cases, ECF No.20 , the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 3/29/2024 in Corrales v. Caleres, Inc., et al., 2:24-cv-00107-KJM-CKD is RESET for 6/27/2024 at 2:30 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of an Updated Joint Status Report due fourteen (14) days prior. The June hearing will proceed by video conferencing through the Zoom application. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the hearing access information no less than 24 hours before the hearing. Accordingly, the pending Requests for Remote Appearance, ECF Nos.21 &23 , are DENIED as MOOT. (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/15 2:33 PM
CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Angela Diana Ponce, Anthony Corrales.(Fazio, Amanda)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Stipulation Fri 03/15 2:30 PM
STIPULATION (JOINT) To Appear Remotely at Status (PreTrial Scheduling) Conference, by Caleres, Inc.. (Patel, Sona)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Status Report Fri 03/15 2:25 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Caleres, Inc.. (Patel, Sona)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
21 21 misc Request for Telephonic/Remote Appearance Wed 03/13 11:27 AM
REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC/REMOTE APPEARANCE at the 3/29/2024 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE hearing by Anthony Corrales.(Fazio, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 03/05 2:46 PM
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/4/2024 CONSOLIDATING CASES 2:24-cv-0107 KJM CKD and 2:24-cv-0623 KJM AC, DISMISSING Caleres, Inc. without prejudice, DIRECTING Plaintiffs to file a Consolidated Complaint against BG Retail, LLC dba Famous Footwear by 4/17/2024 and DENYING8 Motion to Dismiss as moot. (Donati, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 02/29 12:31 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Consolidation of Related Cases by Caleres, Inc., Famous Footwear.(Asterlin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Joint Stipulation
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
18 18 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 02/21 2:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/21/2024: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 6/27/2024 is ADVANCED to 3/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a Joint Status Report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
17 17 misc Reply Fri 02/16 9:11 AM
REPLY by Caleres, Inc., Famous Footwear re8 Motion to Dismiss,. (Nader, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
16 16 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 02/14 2:51 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Patel, Sona)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 01/31 10:23 AM
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/30/24 SETTING the following deadlines: Opposition: 02/06/24 and Reply: 02/16/24. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
14 14 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 01/30 1:24 PM
OPPOSITION by Anthony Corrales to8 Motion to Dismiss,.(Fazio, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF AMANDA FAZIO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
13 13 misc Civil New Case Documents for KJM Wed 01/24 10:11 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Donati, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
12 12 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 01/24 4:21 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Opposition and Reply Deadlines on Motion to Dismiss re8 Motion to Dismiss by Anthony Corrales.(Fazio, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 01/24 3:04 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Opposition and Reply Deadlines on Motion to Dismiss by Anthony Corrales.(Fazio, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
10 10 5 pgs order Order Wed 01/24 12:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Deputy Clerk J. Donati for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/24/2024: The court has determined that it inadvertently served the incorrect text version of the Order Setting Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference when this case was first opened. The text of the order that should have been served is attached here. To the extent the substantive provisions of this order conflict with the previously issued order, this order controls. Counsel should carefully review this version of the order and note changes applicable to future events in this case. By providing a copy of the correct text of the order, the court is not setting any new dates or changing and dates previously set. SO ORDERED. (Donati, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/19 3:14 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Amanda Luisa Fazio on behalf of Anthony Corrales. Attorney Fazio, Amanda Luisa added. (Fazio, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss Tue 01/16 2:51 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Caleres, Inc., Famous Footwear. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller.(Nader, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael J. Nader,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/10 12:37 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Roman Shkodnik on behalf of Anthony Corrales. (Shkodnik, Roman)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Interested Parties Wed 01/10 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Anthony Corrales. (Shkodnik, Roman)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/10 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Compliance with 28 USDC 1446(d) by Caleres, Inc., Famous Footwear. (Asterlin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Wed 01/10 9:27 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-0107 KJM CKD. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
3 3 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 01/09 10:38 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Asterlin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Tue 01/09 9:37 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Clemente Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
Monday, January 08, 2024
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 23CV012350 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11278144) (Asterlin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Certification of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement,
Att: 3 Declaration of Tom Burke,
Att: 4 Declaration of Zachary Minute