New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Case #: 1:24-cv-00038
Nature of Suit625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881
Cause21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Terminated:May 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 07, 2024 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
$180,000.00 United States Currency
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Elizabeth M. Palma
United States Attorney'S Office - Buffalo
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 31, 2024
14 14 utility Remark Fri 05/31 11:45 AM
Return of Service re Order for Forfeiture (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
13 13 order Judgment Fri 05/17 1:46 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF FORFEITURE. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 5/16/2024. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Oral Argument ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 05/16 1:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo: Oral Argument10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to $180,000.00 United States Currency filed by United States of America held on 5/16/2024. AUSA Palma provided update as to service of the motion and indicated no response received from either potential claimant or his attorney. Court grants motion for default judgment and signed the Default Judgment and Order of Forfeiture. Appearances. For plaintiff: AUSA Elizabeth M. Palma. (Court Reporter Ann M. Sawyer.) (CMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
11 11 order Text Order Fri 04/12 11:07 AM
TEXT ORDER re:10 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by the plaintiff. Responses due by 5/2/2024. Reply due by 5/15/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/12/2024. (DJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
10 10 motion Default Judgment Thu 04/11 1:47 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to $180,000.00 United States Currency by United States of America.(Palma, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of AUSA Elizabeth Palma,
Att: 2 Proposed Default Judgment and Order of Forfeiture,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 04, 2024
9 9 order Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/04 8:54 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to $180,000.00 United States Currency (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
8 8 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 04/03 3:55 PM
REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by United States of America against $180,000.00 United States Currency. (Palma, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
7 7 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 03/29 7:57 AM
TEXT ORDER. Based on plaintiff's informal adjournment request, the Oral Argument set for 4/11/2024 is adjourned to 5/16/2024 at 10:30 AM in U.S. District Court, 2 Niagara Square, Niagara Courtroom, 8th Floor West, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 3/29/2024. (CMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
6 6 minutes Docket Call ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/28 1:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo: Warrant in Rem Return Date held on 3/28/2024. AUSA Bailey covering for AUSA Palma, and provided case update notifying the plan is to file a request for clerk's entry of default and subsequent motion for judgment by default. Oral Argument set for 4/11/2024 at 9:00 AM in Niagara Courtroom, 8th Floor West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Appearances. AUSA Melanie Bailey for AUSA Elizabeth Palma. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (CMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
5 5 service Service by Publication Mon 02/26 2:20 PM
SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date February 18, 2024. (Palma, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
4 4 service Warrant Returned Thu 02/01 11:04 AM
ARREST WARRANT IN REM Returned Executed as to $180,000.00 United States Currency. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
3 3 service Certificate of Service Tue 01/23 2:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Palma, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
order Warrant Issued Fri 01/12 12:07 PM
ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. Warrant Hearing set for 3/28/2024 09:00 AM in Niagara Courtroom, 8th Floor West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (TMK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/10 11:53 AM
Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Wed 01/10 11:57 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/09 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Palma on behalf of United States of America (Palma, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/09 2:02 PM
COMPLAINT Civil Forfeiture Complaint against $180,000.00 United States Currency, filed by United States of America.(Palma, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Request for Arrest Warrant in Rem Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Arrest Warrant In Rem