Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-82346

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:24-ap-80002
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2024
Terminated:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Three Sticks Lending
P.O. Box 1145
Mission, SD 57555
Plaintiff
John Craft
1219 Seton Ave SE
Decatur, AL 35601
Represented By
John C. Larsen
Larsen Law, P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Michele T. Hatcher
Chapter 13 Trustee P.O. Box 2388
Decatur, AL 35602


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/21 2:17 PM
Adversary Case 8:24-ap-80002 Closed (mmb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 19, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 05/19 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement
Friday, May 17, 2024
16 16 court Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/21 2:15 PM
Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (mmb)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Fri 05/17 2:27 PM
Final Order Approving Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Related [+], Approving Application For Compensation for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to , Fees awarded: $9,000.00, Expenses awarded: $0.00; Awarded on 5/17/2024 Signed on 5/17/2024. (dwh)
Related: [-] #10 #11
Thursday, April 18, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 04/18 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Tentative Ruling on Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement and Application for Approval of Attorney's Fees
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
12 12 order Tentative Ruling on Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement and for Approval of Atty Fees Tue 04/16 11:12 AM
Tentative Ruling on Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement and Application for Approval of Attorney's Fees Signed on 4/16/2024 Related [+]. Objections due by 5/17/2024. (tcw)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement filed by Plaintiff John Craft,11 Application for Compensation filed by Plaintiff John Craft
Thursday, April 11, 2024
11 11 motion Compensation Thu 04/11 1:41 PM
Application for Compensation of Attorney's Fee for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 1/4/2024 to 4/11/2024, Fee: $9,000.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney John C. Larsen (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Approve Compromise and/or Settlement - Motion Thu 04/11 1:40 PM
Joint Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Regarding Alleged Stay Violation under Rule 9019 Filed by Plaintiff John Craft (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 02/14 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 02/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic)
Monday, February 12, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order (Generic-no hearing) Mon 02/12 2:58 PM
Order Vacating Deadlines Signed on 2/12/2024 Related [+]. (ksv)
Related: [-] 7 Report to Court filed by Plaintiff John Craft
7 7 misc Report to Court Mon 02/12 11:55 AM
Report to Court Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff John Craft. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 10, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 02/10 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 02/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order (Generic)
Thursday, February 08, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order (Generic-no hearing) Thu 02/08 11:01 AM
Order Requiring Briefs On The Issue of Sovereign Immunity Signed on 2/8/2024. (tcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/07 7:19 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Three Sticks Lending. (Watkins, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/09 4:13 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued Three Sticks Lending Date Issued 1/9/2024, Answer Due 2/8/2024 (tcw)
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Tue 01/09 10:30 AM
Summons Issued Three Sticks Lending Date Issued 1/9/2024, Answer Due 2/8/2024 (tcw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/08 4:01 PM
Adversary case 24-80002 14 Related [+]) Complaint by John Craft against Three Sticks Lending. Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $350 (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - BNC Certificate of Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Debtor's Bank Statement