Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Steven D Merryday
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:24-cv-00090
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Re-opened:Nov 27, 2024
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 07, 2024 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
UMA Education, Inc.
Represented By
William Edward Grob
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tampa
contact info
Christopher M. Cascino
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Charlotte C. Smith
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Ignacio J. Garcia
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tampa
contact info
Plaintiff
Yvanne Julmice
Represented By
Juan Garibay
Wallace Miller
contact info
Bradley William Butcher
Butcher & Associates, Pl
contact info
Juan Manuel Garibay
Wallace Miller
contact info
Mark R. Miller
Wallace Miller
contact info
Paulina Rose Kennedy
Sommers Schwartz, PC
contact info
Jason J. Thompson
Sommers Schwartz, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
75 75 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/22 11:56 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Merryday. New case number: 8:24-cv-90-SDM-SPF. Judge William F. Jung no longer assigned to the case. (MCB)
Related: [-]
74 74 notice Notice of Hearing - Cancel Tue 04/22 11:07 AM
NOTICE canceling hearing scheduled for today, 4/22/2025. (CCB)
Related: [-]
73 73 order Order Tue 04/22 11:01 AM
ENDORSED ORDER of recusal. With apologies to the parties for this late notice, the Court has reviewed the pending motions in detail. The undersigned recalls (vaguely) representing Ultimate Medical Academy, LLC in the mid-2010's. When the undersigned checked the federal filings, no such cases could be found. However, several closed cases can be found in the Hillsborough County court system where the undersigned was counsel for UMA. None of these ever went to trial or proceeded very far. However, the undersigned did confer with local officers or lawyers of UMA in the role of attorney counsel. Having refreshed recollection, the undersigned did receive attorneys fees during this time frame for those services. Accordingly the undersigned recuses himself and directs the Clerk to randomly reassign this case on an expedited basis. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/22/2025. (Jung, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
72 72 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/18 1:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re56 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Conditional Collective Certification and Court-Authorized Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C § 216(b) filed by Yvanne Julmice. (Miller, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
71 71 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 2:56 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Julia Ozello may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Within twenty-one days from the date of this order, counsel shall register with the Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/17/2025. (CED)
Related: [-]
70 70 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 10:46 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Julia Ozello to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23257430 for $150 by Yvanne Julmice. (Miller, Mark)
Related: [-]