California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:24-mc-80005
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Terminated:May 24, 2024
In Re
Reddit, Inc.
Movant
Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.
Movant
Cinetel Films, Inc.
Movant
Family of the Year Productions, LLC
Movant
Killing Link Distribution, LLC
Movant
Laundry Films, Inc.
Movant
Screen Media Ventures, LLC
Movant
Voltage Holdings, LLC

GPO Feb 07 2024
ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson re 16 Motion to Compel, 17 Motion for Joinder. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 30, 2024
46 46 appeal USCA Order Thu 01/02 8:43 AM
ORDER of USCA as to41 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
45 45 misc Transcript Mon 09/23 6:58 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on May 16, 2024, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Ana Dub, RDR, CRR, telephone number 415-290-1651/ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2024. (amd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 40 Transcript Order (s)40
Sunday, July 14, 2024
44 44 misc Transcript Sun 07/14 4:49 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on May 16, 2024, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Ana Dub, RDR, CRR, telephone number 415-290-1651/ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2024. (amd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 40 Transcript Order (s)40
Monday, July 08, 2024
43 43 appeal Transcript Designation Form Mon 07/08 4:51 PM
Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 5/16/2024 before Judge Judge James Donato, re41 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, Transcript due by 8/9/2024. (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
42 42 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 06/25 5:59 PM
USCA Notice of Docketing and Case Number 24-3893 for41 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
41 41 appeal Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Mon 06/17 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Screen Media Ventures, LLC. Appeal of Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Joinder26 , Motion Hearing, Terminate Motions, Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief37 (Appeal fee of $605 receipt number ACANDC-19528597 paid.) (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 15, 2024
40 40 misc Transcript Order Sat 06/15 4:50 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 16, 2024 before Judge James Donato by Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
39 39 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 06/13 2:44 PM
ORDER. The request for an extension of time to file a notice of appeal, Dkt. No. 38, is denied for lack of good cause. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/13/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
38 38 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 06/12 7:55 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR 30 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC.(Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kerry S. Culpepper,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 16, 2024
37 37 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/24 10:57 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2024.Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dubb. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2024)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
36 36 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 03/12 2:33 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byFamily of the Year Productions, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Laundry Films, Inc., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC.(Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-] 29 First MOTION MOTION FOR DE NOVO DETERMINATION OF DISPOSITIVE MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND/OR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re26 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Joinder
Att: 1 Exhibit "A",
Att: 2 Exhibit "B"
Monday, March 11, 2024
35 35 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 03/11 1:54 PM
ORDER. For Dkt. No. 34, the motion, Dkt. No. 29, will be heard on May 16, 2024, at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/11/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
34 34 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/06 12:19 PM
MOTION NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION [DOC. #29] FOR DE NOVO DETERMINATION OF DISPOSITIVE MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND/OR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re29 First MOTION MOTION FOR DE NOVO DETERMINATION OF DISPOSITIVE MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND/OR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re26 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Joinder filed by Family of the Year Productions, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Laundry Films, Inc., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 3/5/2024. Replies due by 3/12/2024. (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
33 33 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 03/05 4:25 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byReddit, Inc.. (Schwartz, Julie)
Related: [-] 29 First MOTION MOTION FOR DE NOVO DETERMINATION OF DISPOSITIVE MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND/OR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re26 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Joinder
Monday, February 26, 2024
32 32 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/26 4:35 PM
ORDER. A status conference is set for May 16, 2024, at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/26/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/20 2:42 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
30 30 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 02/20 1:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/20 12:13 PM
First MOTION MOTION FOR DE NOVO DETERMINATION OF DISPOSITIVE MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND/OR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re26 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Joinder filed by Family of the Year Productions, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Laundry Films, Inc., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 3/5/2024. Replies due by 3/12/2024.(Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 copy of unpublished decision Digital Shape Tech,
Att: 3 copy of unpublished decision Cablevision
Thursday, February 15, 2024
28 28 oth_sup Statement of Non-Opposition Thu 02/15 3:03 PM
Statement of Non-Opposition re27 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to Augment Record to include Exhibits "A", "B" and "C" filed byReddit, Inc.. Related [+] (Schottlaender, Hayden)
Related: [-] 27
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
27 27 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Wed 02/14 12:39 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to Augment Record to include Exhibits "A", "B" and "C" filed by Family of the Year Productions, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Laundry Films, Inc., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 2/20/2024.(Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Decl of Kerry Culpepper,
Att: 2 Exhibit "A",
Att: 3 Exhibit "B",
Att: 4 Exhibit "C",
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
26 26 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Joinder Wed 02/07 2:38 PM
ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson re 16 Motion to Compel, 17 Motion for Joinder. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 02/06 2:12 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 24 Stipulation requesting to appear by telephone at hearing. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 02/06 10:29 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REDDIT, INC.S STIPULATED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE filed by Reddit, Inc..(Schottlaender, Hayden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone Tue 01/30 1:09 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 22 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
22 22 motion Appear by Telephone Fri 01/26 10:59 PM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone Motion for leave to appear remotely at hearing filed by Family of the Year Productions, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Laundry Films, Inc., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC.(Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 01/26 6:26 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byFamily of the Year Productions, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Laundry Films, Inc., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC.(Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-] 16 MOTION to Compel Notice of Hearing on Feb. 15, 2024, at 10:00 a.m
Att: 1 Affidavit Decl. of Kerry Culpepper,
Att: 2 Exhibit "1"
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
20 20 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 01/23 2:57 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] (Motion to Compel Dkt. 1) filed byReddit, Inc..(Schottlaender, Hayden)
Related: [-] 16 MOTION to Compel Notice of Hearing on Feb. 15, 2024, at 10:00 a.m
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Declaration of Hayden M. Schottlaender
Monday, January 22, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/22 9:32 AM
ORDER RELATING CASE. The court finds that the cases are not related: 23-mc-80173-LB and 24-mc-80005-TSH. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 01/22/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
18 18 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 01/19 9:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Family of the Year Productions, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Laundry Films, Inc. (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Joinder Fri 01/19 8:53 PM
MOTION for Joinder filed by Laundry Films, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Family of the Year Productions, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Compel Fri 01/19 8:25 PM
MOTION to Compel Notice of Hearing on Feb. 15, 2024, at 10:00 a.m filed by Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 2/2/2024. Replies due by 2/9/2024. (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
15 15 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 01/18 5:12 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Reddit, Inc. and Certification of Conflicts (Schottlaender, Hayden)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/18 11:25 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 01/17 6:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reddit, Inc. (Schwartz, Julie)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Wed 01/17 6:31 PM
RESPONSE re5 Order, (dated January 10, 2024) by Reddit, Inc.. (Schwartz, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/16 3:00 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19024647.) filed by Reddit, Inc..(Schottlaender, Hayden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/16 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jameson Ullman for Reddit, Inc. (Ullman, Jameson)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/16 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Erin Schwartz for Reddit, Inc. (Schwartz, Julie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 01/10 5:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc. for Screen Media Ventures, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 01/10 12:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC re5 Order, (Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/10 11:52 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/10 11:51 AM
ORDER re 1 Motion to Compel. Reddit shall file a statement by January 17, 2024 stating whether it consents to having this matter transferred to the Southern District of New York Bankruptcy Court. Movants shall serve this order on Reddit and file proof of service by January 11, 2024. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/10/2024. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/10 11:49 AM
ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING SCHEUDLE re 1 Motion to Compel filed by Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/10/2024. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 01/10 8:25 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/24/2024. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/09 4:47 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19006147.) filed by Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC.(Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 DC Certificate of Good Standing
1 1 cmp Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening) Tue 01/09 2:27 PM
MOTION TO COMPEL against Reddit, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 52, receipt number ACANDC-19005024.). Filed by Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC.(Clinton, Tobi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kerry S. Culpepper,
Att: 2 Exhibit "1",
Att: 3 Exhibit "2",
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Compel,
Att: 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Expedited Briefing,
Att: 6 Certificate/Proof of Service