Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah D Morrison
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:24-cv-00085
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 07, 2024 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Hi-Vac Corporation
Represented By
Stuart G Torch
Employment Law Partners, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean Daye
Represented By
Christopher Wido
The Spitz Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/24 2:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Plaintiff Sean Daye. (Wido, Christopher)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 04/25 9:50 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (kk2)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
9 9 order Order Mon 03/25 2:42 PM
NOTATION ORDER The Court has been advised that the parties have reached a settlement in principle that resolves all claims against all parties. The parties are ORDERED to file a Status Report by 4/24/24 unless dismissal filed prior. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 3/25/2024. (merc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
8 8 misc Status Report Thu 03/21 7:38 PM
STATUS REPORT regarding settlement by Defendant Hi-Vac Corporation. (Torch, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/05 1:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Hi-Vac Corporation. (Torch, Stuart)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/05 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart G Torch for Defendant Hi-Vac Corporation (Torch, Stuart)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 02/05 10:57 AM
NOTATION ORDER The Court has been advised that the parties have reached a settlement in principle that resolves all claims against all parties. The parties are ORDERED to file a Status Report within 45 days of this Order unless dismissal filed prior. Status Report due to the Court on 3/21/2024. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 2/5/2024. (merc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/23 10:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed: Hi-Vac Corporation served on 1/18/2024, answer due 2/8/2024 (kk2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Clerk Wed 01/17 1:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing By Clerk: Summons and Complaint sent by certified mail to Hi-Vac Corporation & Hi-Vac Corporation c/o Corporation Service Company (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 01/10 10:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Hi-Vac Corporation & Hi-Vac Corporation c/o Corporation Service Company (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/09 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Damages against Hi-Vac Corporation ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9759683), filed by Sean Daye. (Wido, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Form Summons X2