Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:24-cv-00076
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Terminated:May 31, 2024
Case in other court:District Court of the State of Nevada Clark County, A-23-881426-C
Last checked: Sunday Jul 07, 2024 2:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Creed Boutique Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By
Lori N. Brown
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Angelica Hemingway
Represented By
James P. Kemp
Kemp & Kemp
contact info


Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Monday, June 03, 2024
minord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/03 12:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/3/2024. By Deputy Clerk: E. Garcia. The Telephonic Status Hearing scheduled for Wednesday, June 5, 2024 at 10:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah is VACATED . Parties filed the Stipulation to Dismiss (ECF No. 19). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Mon 06/03 1:49 PM
ORDER granting19 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/31/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
19 19 motion Stipulation Thu 05/30 3:30 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS with Prejudice by Defendant Creed Boutique Las Vegas, LLC. (Brown, Lori) (dismiss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 04/16 2:16 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 4/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Pla Counsel: James P. Kemp and Plaintiff Angelica Hemingway ; Def Counsel: Lori Brown and Defendant Representatives Cheryl Beall, Cameron Turner, and Nefe Islam An early neutral evaluation was conducted before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah commencing at 9:00 a.m. on April 16, 2024. Discussions concluded at approximately 1:15 p.m. A settlement was reached, the terms of which are confidential. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephonic status hearing with counsel is scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, June 5, 2024 . If dismissal papers are lodged with the Court by or before this date, the telephonic status hearing will be automatically vacated. The Parties are instructed to call the Audio Conference Line at (888) 251-2909, access code 7771745 , five (5) minutes prior to the hearing time. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
16 16 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Thu 03/14 9:47 AM
NON-OPPOSITION to15 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically, by Plaintiff Angelica Hemingway. (Kemp, James)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Motion Leave to Appear Telephonically Thu 03/14 9:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically, Attorney Lori N. Brown, re8 Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session, by Defendant Creed Boutique Las Vegas, LLC. Responses due by 3/28/2024.(Brown, Lori) (presiding)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
minord Minute Order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Thu 03/14 12:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/14/2024. By Law Clerk: C. Denbow Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Remote Appearance at ENE (ECF No. 15 ). Defendant Creed Boutique Las Vegas, LLC ("Defendant") requests that Defendant and Defendant's counsel be allowed to remotely attend the April 16, 2024 Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE"). Defendant's Insurance Adjuster is also out of state. While Defendant does not include the adjuster in the request for remote appearance, the Court requires the adjuster's attendance at the ENE. Plaintiff does not oppose Defendant's remote appearance request. ECF No. 16 . Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Remote Appearance at ENE (ECF No. 15 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's counsel must contact Elvia Garcia, Courtroom Deputy for the undersigned Magistrate Judge, by 12:00pm on April 15, 2024, at Elvia_Garcia@nvd.uscourts.gov, and provide email addresses for defense counsel, Defendant's representative, and Defendant's insurance adjuster, all of whom must appear and participate in the ENE. The courtroom deputy will email participants the Zoom link. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
14 14 notice Notice Other Thu 03/07 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery by Creed Boutique Las Vegas, LLC.. (Brown, Lori)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
12 12 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 02/16 4:14 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/15/2024. Motions due by 8/14/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 2/16/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Fri 02/16 4:14 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
11 11 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 02/14 10:12 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Angelica Hemingway.. (Kemp, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
10 10 misc Status Report Thu 02/08 10:47 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant Creed Boutique Las Vegas, LLC.. (Brown, Lori)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
9 9 misc Statement in Removal Case Tue 01/23 10:32 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Creed Boutique Las Vegas, LLC.. (Brown, Lori)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 01/19 9:07 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Creed Boutique Las Vegas, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent International Cosmetics and Perfumes, Inc., Corporate Parent Fontaine Group, Corporate Parent Kering for Creed Boutique Las Vegas, LLC added.. (Brown, Lori)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Fri 01/19 9:41 AM
ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation is set for Tuesday, 4/16/2024. Plaintiff must report to the chambers of the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge, Room 3005, Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Las Vegas, Nevada at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/18/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/16 3:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Creed Boutique Las Vegas, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/26/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/1/2024.(Brown, Lori)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 01/12 7:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Angelica Hemingway. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemp, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
3 3 minord Minute Order Removal Case Wed 01/10 11:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/10/2024. By Deputy Clerk: C. Smith. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/25/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 01/10 11:03 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (CJS)
Related: [-]
notice ENE Notice Wed 01/10 11:03 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (CJS)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Wed 01/10 1:13 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Tue 01/09 2:56 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court of Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-23-881426-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7548908) by Creed Boutique Las Vegas, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/19/2024. (Brown, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet